Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:15-bk-60229

Illinois Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William V Altenberger
Case #: 6:17-ap-06011
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2017
Terminated:Dec 29, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
California Bank and Trust, a division of ZIONS BANCORPORATION
2460 South 3270 West
West Valley, UT 84119
Represented By
California Bank and Trust
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert T Bruegge
130 N Main St PO Box 510
Edwardsville, IL 62025
Represented By
Amanda McQuaid
Heplerbroom LLC
contact info
Steven M Wallace
Heplerbroom LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, July 28, 2022
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Fri 07/29 11:30 AM
Receipt Number 96143, Fee Amount $350.00 Related [+]. (jf)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Robert T Bruegge
Sunday, December 31, 2017
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 12/31 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/31/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Order on Application to Compromise Controversy
Friday, December 29, 2017
28 28 order Compromise Controversy Fri 12/29 1:44 PM
Order Granting Application To Compromise Controversy Related [+] (js)
Related: [-] 26
Monday, December 11, 2017
utility Update Other Deadlines Mon 12/11 10:24 AM
Other Deadlines Updated Related [+]. Miscellaneous Deadline for follow-up on the Application to Settle and Compromise : 12/28/2017. (ko)
Related: [-] 24 Order on Motion to Extend Time, Update Other Deadlines (Adv)
Thursday, December 07, 2017
27 27 notice Notice of Motion Thu 12/07 9:40 AM
Notice of Motion of Trustee's Application to Settle and Compromise Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Robert T Bruegge Related [+]. Objections to Motion due: 12/28/2017. (McQuaid, Amanda)
Related: [-] 26 Application to Compromise Controversy filed by Plaintiff Robert T Bruegge
26 26 motion Compromise Controversy Thu 12/07 9:38 AM
Application to Compromise Controversy with California Bank and Trust Filed by Plaintiff Robert T Bruegge (McQuaid, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Executed Settlement Agreement
Thursday, November 09, 2017
25 25 court Corrective Entry Thu 11/09 1:00 PM
Corrective Entry - Docket text should reflect Miscellaneous Deadline to file Application to Settle and Compromise: 12/8/2017 Related [+]. (kw)
Related: [-] 24 Order on Motion to Extend Time
24 24 order Extend Time Thu 11/09 12:57 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Miscellaneous Deadline to file Motion for Improper Venue : 12/8/2017. (kw)
Related: [-] 23
utility Update Other Deadlines Thu 11/09 1:05 PM
Other Deadlines Updated Related [+]. Miscellaneous Deadline for follow-up on the Application to Settle and Compromise: 12/8/2017. (kw)
Related: [-] 24 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, November 08, 2017
23 23 motion Extend Time Wed 11/08 4:20 PM
Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Motion for Improper Venue Pending Outcome of Application to Settle and Compromise Filed by Plaintiff Robert T Bruegge (McQuaid, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2017
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 09/27 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/27/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Minutes of Court
Monday, September 25, 2017
21 21 order Minutes of Court Mon 09/25 3:15 PM
Minutes of Court Related [+]. Miscellaneous Deadline to file Motion for Improper Venue: 11/9/2017. (jf)
Related: [-] 1 Continuing Generally Complaint filed by Plaintiff Robert T Bruegge
Wednesday, August 23, 2017
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 08/23 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/23/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Minutes of Court
Monday, August 21, 2017
19 19 order Minutes of Court Mon 08/21 12:16 PM
Minutes of Court Related [+]. Pretrial Hearing before Judge William V. Altenberger scheduled for 9/25/2017 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Court ESTL. (jf)
Related: [-] 1 Continuing Pretrial Hearing on the Complaint filed by Plaintiff Robert T Bruegge
Friday, August 18, 2017
18 18 misc Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/18 3:42 PM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant California Bank and Trust. (Koch, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2017
17 17 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 08/04 3:59 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 with Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant California Bank and Trust. (Duncan, Peter)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 30, 2017
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 07/30 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order
Saturday, July 29, 2017
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 07/29 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/29/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 07/29 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/29/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Pre-Trial Hearing Scheduled
Friday, July 28, 2017
13 13 order Order Fri 07/28 8:59 AM
Order for Corporate Ownership Statement. Miscellaneous Deadline: 8/11/2017. (jl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2017
12 12 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/27 1:58 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice Related [+] (jl)
Related: [-] 9
11 11 court Pre-Trial Hearing Scheduled Thu 07/27 11:18 AM
Pre-Trial Hearing Scheduled Related [+]. Pre-Trial Hearing before Judge William V. Altenberger scheduled for 8/21/2017 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Court ESTL. (ko)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers filed by Plaintiff Robert T Bruegge
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Thu 07/27 12:50 PM
District Court Receipt Number 44625008223, Fee Amount $200.00 Related [+]. (nm)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Defendant California Bank and Trust
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/26 5:59 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by California Bank and Trust. (Duncan, Peter)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/26 12:48 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Defendant California Bank and Trust (Duncan, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2017
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/28 1:26 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Robert T Bruegge Related [+]. (Wallace, Steven)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, June 27, 2017
7 7 order Extend Time Tue 06/27 11:12 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Deadline to File Answer: 7/26/2017. (jl)
Related: [-] 6
Monday, June 26, 2017
6 6 motion Extend Time Mon 06/26 8:39 AM
Second Motion to Extend Time Filed by Plaintiff Robert T Bruegge (Wallace, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2017
5 5 order Extend Time Mon 05/22 12:41 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time. Related [+] Answer due for California Bank and Trust: 6/26/2017. (rj)
Related: [-] 4
Friday, May 19, 2017
4 4 motion Extend Time Fri 05/19 11:23 AM
Motion to Extend Time Filed by Plaintiff Robert T Bruegge (McQuaid, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2017
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/25 2:32 PM
Summons Service Executed on California Bank and Trust 4/25/2017 .. (McQuaid, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 04/24 3:31 PM
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/24 3:31 PM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint by Robert T Bruegge against California Bank & Trust. (McQuaid, Amanda)
Related: [-]