CONFERENCE OF STATE BANK SUPERVISORS v. OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Dabney L Friedrich |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00763 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 23, 2017 5:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
THOMAS J. CURRY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CONFERENCE OF STATE BANK SUPERVISORS
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 30 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the 9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 30, 2018. |
1. | U.S. judge dismisses state regulators' lawsuit over national 'fintech' charter (wkzo.com) |
Submitted Tue 05/01/2018 | |
2. | State banking regulators sue feds over proposal to establish a special-purpose national bank charter (nationallawjournal.com) |
Submitted Thu 04/27/2017 | |
3. | State Banking Regulators Sue Federal Agency to Stop Charters for Fintech Firms (wsj.com) |
Submitted Thu 04/27/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
20
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Mon 04/30 7:43 PM
|
|
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 04/30 7:42 PM
|
|
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/30 7:39 PM
|
||
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 12/05 2:01 PM
Case directly reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) |
||
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 11/28 2:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's17 Unopposed Motion for Oral Argument. The Court will hold Plaintiff's motion IN ABEYANCE pending further consideration of Defendants'9 Motion to Dismiss and the related briefing. If the Court, in its discretion, determines that oral argument would aid it in its resolution of Defendants' motion, it will schedule such an argument at a later date. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/28/2017. (lcckk3) |
||
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 11/22 2:43 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Oral Argument by CONFERENCE OF STATE BANK SUPERVISORS (Semko, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 11/09 11:06 AM
Case randomly reassigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Judge Trevor N. McFadden is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 11/02 11:08 AM
Case directly reassigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Judge James E. Boasberg is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) |
||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Wed 10/04 5:33 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by THOMAS J. CURRY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Jordan, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Wed 09/13 7:57 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by CONFERENCE OF STATE BANK SUPERVISORS.(Semko, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/13 5:44 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew Kluchenek, :Firm- Baker & McKenzie LLP, :Address- 300 East Randolph Drive, Suite 5000; Chicago, Illinois 60601. Phone No. - (312) 861-8803. Fax No. - 312-861-2899 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5114863. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CONFERENCE OF STATE BANK SUPERVISORS(Semko, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Matthew Kluchenek, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/13 5:27 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Graham Cronogue, :Firm- Baker & McKenzie LLP, :Address- 815 Connecticut Ave., N.W.; Washington, D.C. 20006. Phone No. - 202-835-6249. Fax No. - 202-416--7249 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5114852. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CONFERENCE OF STATE BANK SUPERVISORS(Semko, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Graham Cronogue, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/13 6:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of GRAHAM CRONOGUE. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/13/2017. (lcjeb3) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/13 6:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of MATTHEW KLUCHENK. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/13/2017. (lcjeb3) |
||
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
File Excess Pages
Fri 09/08 8:28 AM
Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Regarding Motion to Dismiss by CONFERENCE OF STATE BANK SUPERVISORS(Semko, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Fri 09/08 9:09 AM
MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Joint11 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Briefs. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff may file an opposition brief not to exceed 55 pages and Defendants may file a reply brief not to exceed 32 pages. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/8/2017. (lcjeb2) |
||
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 08/09 11:13 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by CONFERENCE OF STATE BANK SUPERVISORS(Semko, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 08/09 1:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER GRANTING10 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff shall file its opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or before September 13, 2017, and Defendants shall reply on or before October 4, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/9/2017. (lcjeb3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 08/10 4:24 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/13/2017. Replies due by 10/4/2017. (nbn) |
||
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Wed 08/02 4:20 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by THOMAS J. CURRY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY(Jordan, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex F, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex G, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex H | ||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss
Fri 07/28 2:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by THOMAS J. CURRY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY(Jordan, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit K | ||
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 07/28 3:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendants'8 Motion to Dismiss is STRICKEN. Its excessive footnoting both violates LCvR 5.1(d) and appears to be an effort to circumvent page limitations. The Court ORDERS that Defendants may submit a renewed Motion to Dismiss by August 2, 2017, that contains no more than 10 footnotes containing an aggregate of no more than 50 lines. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/28/2017. (lcjeb3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 07/28 3:56 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Renewed Dispositive Motions due by 8/2/2017. (lsj) |
||
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Related Case
Thu 07/20 4:21 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. Case related to Case No. 17-CV-03574 (S.D.N.Y.2017). (Jordan, Douglas) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/20 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Bradford Jordan on behalf of OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (Jordan, Douglas) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to
Fri 06/02 3:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by THOMAS J. CURRY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY(Koch, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/02 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Chadwell Koch on behalf of All Defendants (Koch, Peter) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Fri 06/02 3:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead on or before July 28, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/2/2017. (lcjeb3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 06/02 3:48 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/28/2017. (nbn) |
||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
Fri 04/28 4:39 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/28/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/27/2017. (Chasin, Steven) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Thu 04/27 10:24 AM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to THOMAS J. CURRY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Forms)(jd) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/26 10:02 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY AND THOMAS J. CURRY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4928392) filed by CONFERENCE OF STATE BANK SUPERVISORS.(Semko, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/27 10:16 AM
Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (jd) |