Barnes v. Simon et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:17-cv-02351
Lead case: 2:17-cv-02351
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Arthur D Spatt |
Referred: | Anne Y Shields |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02501 |
Nature of Suit | 160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits |
Cause | 12:22 Securities Fraud |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 23, 2017 4:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
Richard C. Berke
|
|
Defendant
Pasquale Conte
|
|
Defendant
Andrew R. Heyer
|
|
Defendant
Raymond W. Kelly
|
|
Defendant
Roger Meltzer
|
|
Defendant
Scott M. O'Neil
|
|
Defendant
Adrianne Shapira
|
|
Defendant
Irwin D. Simon
|
|
Defendant
The Hain Celestial Group, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Lawrence S. Zilavy
|
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Barnes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, December 30, 2022 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Letter
Fri 12/30 6:25 PM
Letter Joint Status Reoirt by Jennifer Barnes Associated Cases: 2:17-cv-02351-JS-JMW, 2:17-cv-02501-ADS-AYS, 2:17-cv-03119-ADS-AYS, 2:17-cv-05408-JFB-SIL (Amon, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, November 16, 2022 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Firm/Email
Wed 11/16 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address Once the filing has been made, you must login to www.pacer.gov and update your account. Associated Cases: 2:17-cv-02351-JS-JMW, 2:17-cv-02501-ADS-AYS, 2:17-cv-03119-ADS-AYS, 2:17-cv-05408-JFB-SIL (Amon, Thomas) |
|
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Firm/Email
Fri 01/24 3:35 PM
NOTICE of Change of Firm Name and Address Once the filing has been made, you must login to www.pacer.gov and update your account. Associated Cases: 2:17-cv-02351-ADS-AYS, 2:17-cv-02501-ADS-AYS, 2:17-cv-03119-ADS-AYS, 2:17-cv-05408-JFB-SIL (Amon, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order(Other)
Fri 08/11 11:14 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Consolidating the Related Stockholder Actions and Appointing Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel. The following actions shall be consolidated for all purposes, including pre-trial proceedings and trial, into one consolidated action: Silva v. Simon, et al. [17-cv-2351-ADS-AYS], Barnes v. Simon et al. [17-cv-2501-SJF-AYS] and Merenstein v. Heyer, et al. [17-cv-3119-ADS-AYS]. Every pleading filed in the Consolidated Action, or in any separate action included herein, must bear the following caption: In re The Hain Celestial Group, Inc. Stockholder Class and Derivative Litigation. The files of the Consolidated Action will be maintained in one master file under Lead Case No. 17-cv-2351-ADS-AYS. Co-lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel for plaintiffs for the conduct of In re The Hain Celestial Group, Inc. Stockholder Class and Derivative Litigation, Lead Case No. 17-cv-2351-ADS-AYS is designated as further set forth herein. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the Member Cases, namely, the actions styled Barnes v. Simon et al. [17-cv-2501-SJF-AYS] and Merenstein v. Heyer et al. [17-cv-3119-ADS-AYS]. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 8/10/2017. (Coleman, Laurie) |
|
utility
Create Case Association
Fri 08/11 11:16 AM
CASES ASSOCIATED: Create association to 2:17-cv-02351-ADS-AYS. (Coleman, Laurie) |
||
utility
Case Consolidated
Fri 08/11 11:20 AM
CASE CONSOLIDATED. (Coleman, Laurie) |
||
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Redacted Document
Fri 07/21 11:42 AM
REDACTION to 30 Sealed Order. (Coleman, Laurie) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation
Fri 07/14 4:49 PM
STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONSOLIDATING THE RELATED STOCKHOLDER ACTIONS AND APPOINTING CO-LEAD AND LIAISON COUNSEL by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 06/09 3:35 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Arthur D. Spatt for all further proceedings. Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 6/9/2017. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
||
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
Wed 06/07 5:37 PM
Notice of Related Case (Amon, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice(Other)
Wed 05/03 2:49 PM
NOTICE by Jennifer Barnes Notice of Hearing (Amon, Thomas) |
|
26 | 26
service
Summons Issued
Wed 05/03 10:04 AM
Summons Issued as to Richard C. Berke, Pasquale Conte, Andrew R. Heyer, Raymond W. Kelly, Roger Meltzer, Scott M. O'Neil, Adrianne Shapira, Irwin D. Simon, The Hain Celestial Group, Inc., Lawrence S. Zilavy. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 05/01 4:52 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 05/01 4:44 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 05/01 4:33 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 05/01 4:26 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 05/01 4:22 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 05/01 4:16 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 05/01 4:14 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 05/01 4:11 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 05/01 4:07 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 05/01 4:02 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
notice
Notice(Other)
Mon 05/01 9:41 AM
Proposed summons is rejected; the caption does not reflect the caption of the Complaint. Counsel is advised to submit a corrected proposed summons using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. Please call Clerk's Office at 631-712-6019 for further assistance. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/28 1:53 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Case Management Statement Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/28 1:50 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jennifer Barnes, Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/28 1:42 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/28 1:41 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/28 1:39 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/28 1:37 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/28 1:35 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/28 1:34 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/28 1:32 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/28 1:22 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/28 1:20 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) |
|
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 04/28 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 9/13/2017 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing on Defendants and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Walsh, Kenneth) |
||
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 04/27 2:30 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 04/27 9:09 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. No Summons Issued (Bowens, Priscilla) (Rodin, Deanna). |
|
Att: 1 (4/27/2017) Additional Corrections | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/27 2:29 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint by Jennifer Barnes (Amon, Thomas) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9481183 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Jennifer Barnes. (Amon, Thomas) |