Michigan Eastern District Court
Case #: 5:17-cr-20184
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2017
Terminated:Oct 28, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 29, 2017 6:35 PM EST
Defendant
Andre Chattam (3)
Represented By
Federal Defender
Federal Defender Office
contact info
Keith A. Spielfogel
contact info
Warren E. Harris
contact info
Henry M. Scharg
contact info
Defendant
Kevin Pearson (4)
Represented By
John T. Theis
Law Office Of John T. Theis
contact info
Federal Defender
Federal Defender Office
contact info
David S. Steingold
Law Offices Of David S. Steingold PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Edward Tavorn (2)
Represented By
Federal Defender
Federal Defender Office
contact info
Lawrence B. Shulman
The Shulman Law Firm PLC
contact info
Lisa B. Kirsch Satawa
Kirsch Leach Associates
contact info
Sanford A. Schulman
contact info
Defendant
Corey Toney (1)
Represented By
Matt Savich
contact info
Federal Defender
Federal Defender Office
contact info
Todd Russell Perkins
contact info
Nancy L. McGunn
Federal Defender Office
contact info
Defendant
Sontez Wells (5)
Represented By
Federal Defender
Federal Defender Office
contact info
Harold Z. Gurewitz
Gurewitz & Raben, PLC
contact info
Michael O. Sheehan
Sheehan And Reeve
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Jerome F. Gorgon
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Conor Mulroe
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info

GPO Aug 18 2017
ORDER Designating Case as Complex as to Corey Toney, Edward Tavorn, Andre Chattam, Kevin Pearson and Sontez Wells. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)ORDER Designating Case as Complex as to Corey Toney, Edward Tavorn, Andre Chattam, Kevin Pearson and Sontez Wells. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)ORDER Designating Case as Complex as to Corey Toney, Edward Tavorn, Andre Chattam, Kevin Pearson and Sontez Wells. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)ORDER Designating Case as Complex as to Corey Toney, Edward Tavorn, Andre Chattam, Kevin Pearson and Sontez Wells. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)ORDER Designating Case as Complex as to Corey Toney, Edward Tavorn, Andre Chattam, Kevin Pearson and Sontez Wells. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
GPO Feb 14 2018
ORDER Designating Case as Complex as to George Eubanks and James Bowens. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)ORDER Designating Case as Complex as to George Eubanks and James Bowens. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
GPO Jul 23 2019
ORDER Granting 286 Motion to Dismiss, 338 Motion to Dismiss and Denying Defendant's 344 Request as to James Bowens (7). Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
GPO Dec 17 2019
ORDER granting 407 Motion to file all of Defendants' Ex Parte Letters; and Modifying 380 Jury Semi-Sequestration Order. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar) ORDER granting 407 Motion to file all of Defendants' Ex Parte Letters; and Modifying 380 Jury Semi-Sequestration Order. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar) ORDER granting 407 Motion to file all of Defendants' Ex Parte Letters; and Modifying 380 Jury Semi-Sequestration Order. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
GPO Feb 03 2020
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 411 Motion in Limine as to Edward Tavorn (2), George Eubanks (6), James Bowens (7). Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar) ORDER granting in part and denying in part 411 Motion in Limine as to Edward Tavorn (2), George Eubanks (6), James Bowens (7). Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar) ORDER granting in part and denying in part 411 Motion in Limine as to Edward Tavorn (2), George Eubanks (6), James Bowens (7). Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
GPO Apr 09 2020
ORDER denying 516 Motion for Bond as to George Eubanks (6). Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
GPO Apr 14 2020
ORDER denying 518 Motion for Release from Custody as to James Bowens (7). Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
GPO Apr 16 2020
ORDER denying 525 Motion for Release from Custody as to Kevin Pearson (4). Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
GPO Mar 29 2021
ORDER as to Corey Toney Denying 583 Sealed Petition for Compassionate Release, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
GPO Sep 13 2021
ORDER denying 575 Motion to Reduce Sentence as to Sontez Wells (5); denying 582 Motion to Reduce Sentence as to Sontez Wells (5). Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
GPO Dec 14 2022
ORDER denying without prejudice 597 Motion for Compassionate Release as to George Eubanks (6). Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
GPO Apr 13 2023
ORDER denying without prejudice 605 Motion for Compassionate Release as to Edward Tavorn (2). Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
GPO Nov 12 2024
OPINION AND ORDER denying 624 Motion as to Edward Tavorn (2). Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)

Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 5:56 PM EDT
Thursday, January 05, 2017
1 1 COMPLAINT sworn before Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub as to Corey Toney (1). (SOso) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER WITH MOTION to Seal 2 Arrest Warrant Issued,1 Complaint as to Corey Toney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (SOso) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2017
Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub: Initial Appearance as to Corey Toney held on 1/6/2017. Detention Hearing set for 1/9/2017 01:00 PM Disposition: Defendant temporarily detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Richard Helfrick) (AUSA: Graham Teall) (LBar) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER WITH MOTION to Unseal 2 Arrest Warrant Issued and1 Complaint as to Corey Toney - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
5 5 Public Audio File of Initial Appearance on Complaint as to Corey Toney held on 01/06/2017 before Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. AUDIO FILE SIZE (0.6 MB) (SOso) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER as to Corey Toney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (SOso) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING AND FOR TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Corey Toney Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (SOso) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen: Detention Hearing as to Corey Toney not held on 1/9/2017. Disposition: Defendant consents to detention. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Todd Perkins) (AUSA: Jerome Gorgon) (CCie) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Set Hearings as to Corey Toney: Preliminary Examination set for 1/20/2017 at 1:00 PM - (CCie) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nancy L. McGunn appearing for Corey Toney (McGunn, Nancy) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
9 9 Public Audio File of Proceedings as to Corey Toney held on 01/09/2017 before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. AUDIO FILE SIZE (1.2 MB) (SOso) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
10 10 CONSENT ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Corey Toney Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SOso) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
11 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Todd Russell Perkins appearing for Corey Toney. (SOso) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
12 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Corey Toney Time excluded from 01/20/2017 until 02/03/2017. Preliminary Examination RESET for 2/3/2017 at 1:00 PM - Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (CCie) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2017
13 13 Warrant for Arrest Returned Executed on 01/06/17 as to Corey Toney. (DPer) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
Attorney Nancy L. McGunn is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: no longer represents. (McGunn, Nancy) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
14 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Corey Toney. Preliminary Examination RESET TO 2/24/2017 01:00 PM --Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2017
15 15 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Todd Russell Perkins by Corey Toney. (Perkins, Todd) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2017
16 16 ORDER granting15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Todd Russell Perkins withdrawn from case as to Corey Toney (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (LHos) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2017
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE of CJA Attorney Appointment: Matt Savich has accepted the appointment to represent Corey Toney as of 2/21/2017 . (FDO Siefer, Miriam) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
17 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Corey Toney Time excluded from 02/24/2017 until 3/3/2017. Preliminary Examination RESET for 3/3/2017 AT 1:00 PM - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
18 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Corey Toney Time excluded from 03/08/2017 until 03/17/2017. Preliminary Examination RESET for 3/17/2017 AT 1:00 PM - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
19 19 NOTICE of Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney: Conor Mulroe added. (Mulroe, Conor) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2017
20 20 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matt Savich appearing for Corey Toney (Savich, Matt) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2017
21 21 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Corey Toney Time excluded from 3/17/17 until 3/31/17. Preliminary Examination re-set for 3/31/2017 01:00 PM - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar) [2:17-mj-30008-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2017
22 22 INDICTMENT as to Corey Toney (1) count(s) 1. (LHos)
Related: [-]
23 23 ORDER WITH MOTION to Seal22 Indictment as to Corey Toney. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (LHos)
Related: [-]