Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-34554

Oregon Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:David W Hercher
Case #: 3:17-ap-03059
Nature of Suit71 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - imposition of stay
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2017
Terminated:Mar 23, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cellco Partnership dba Verizon Wireless, C T CORPORATION SYSTEM
388 State st Suite 420
Salem, OR 97301
Represented By
Cellco Partnership dba Verizon Wireless
contact info
Defendant
Cellco Partnership
One Verizon Way Att: Mr. Daniel S Mead, CEO
Basking Ridge, NJ 07920
Represented By
Cellco Partnership
contact info
Defendant
Verizon Wireless Bkcy Admin
404 Brock Dr
Bloomington, IL 61701
Represented By
Verizon Wireless Bkcy Admin
contact info
Plaintiff
Carl Maxwell Joseph
72 Cypress Trail
Lakeland, GA 31635
Represented By
NOAH BISHOP
Bishop Bankruptcy Law, LLC
contact info
ALEXZANDER CJ ADAMS
contact info
Plaintiff
Janis Lynn Joseph
72 Cypress Trail
Lakeland, GA 31635
Represented By
NOAH BISHOP
Bishop Bankruptcy Law, LLC
contact info
ALEXZANDER CJ ADAMS
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Friday, March 23, 2018
33 33 notice Notice of Dismissal Fri 03/23 2:40 PM
Notice of Dismissal as to: Cellco Partnership dba Verizon Wireless Filed By Carl Maxwell Joseph, Janis Lynn Joseph (ADAMS, ALEXZANDER)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/23 3:02 PM
Adversary Case 3:17-ap-3059 Closed (tlh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 22, 2018
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Thu 03/22 9:16 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:31 Order Granting Delay of Closing until 5/3/2018.30 Motion to Extend Time filed by Plaintiff Carl Maxwell Joseph, Plaintiff Janis Lynn Joseph (tlh). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
31 31 order Extend/Shorten Time Tue 03/20 9:41 AM
Order Granting Delay of Closing until 5/3/2018.30 Motion to Extend Time filed by Plaintiff Carl Maxwell Joseph, Plaintiff Janis Lynn Joseph (tlh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 19, 2018
30 30 motion Extend/Shorten Time Mon 03/19 3:27 PM
Motion to Extend Time Filed by Carl Maxwell Joseph, Janis Lynn Joseph Re:28 Order Re: Dismissal or Other Final Disposition (ADAMS, ALEXZANDER)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 04, 2018
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Sun 02/04 9:16 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:28 Order Re: Dismissal or Other Final Disposition Effective Within 45 Days. Last Date to Comply 3/19/2018, (bls). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2018
28 28 order Dismissal or Other Final Disposition Fri 02/02 2:48 PM
Order Re: Dismissal or Other Final Disposition Effective Within 45 Days. Last Date to Comply 3/19/2018, (bls)
Related: [-]
27 27 court Record of Proceeding (Hearing Held) Fri 02/02 2:00 PM
Settlement Conference Held. (bls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2018
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Thu 01/11 9:19 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:24 Notice of Hearing Re: Trial Set for 3/12/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom #3, Portland. (dje). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2018
25 25 court Record of Proceeding (Hearing Continued) Tue 01/09 11:10 AM
Settlement Conference Scheduled for 02/02/2018 at 09:00 AM in Judges' Conference Room, Portland. (sfs)
Related: [-]
24 24 court Notice of and/or Hearing Set SCU Tue 01/09 10:51 AM
Notice of Hearing Re: Trial Set for 3/12/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom #3, Portland. (dje)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2018
23 23 court Record of Proceeding (Hearing Held) Tue 01/09 10:48 AM
Continued Pretrial Conference Held. (dje)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2017
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Thu 08/24 9:19 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:21 Rescheduled Notice of Hearing Re: Trial Set for 2/2/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom #3, Portland. (dje). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2017
21 21 court Notice of and/or Hearing Set SCU Tue 08/22 8:20 AM
Rescheduled Notice of Hearing Re: Trial Set for 2/2/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom #3, Portland. (dje)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2017
20 20 court Record of Proceeding (Hearing Continued) Tue 08/22 8:15 AM
Record of Proceeding Re: Continued Pre-Trial Hearing Set for 1/5/2018 at 10:00 AM by Telephone. (dje)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 01, 2017
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Sat 07/01 9:17 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:18 Notice of Hearing Re:1 Complaint. Continued Pre-Trial Hearing Set for 08/15/2017 at 10:00 AM by Telephone Hearing. (dda). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2017
18 18 court Notice of and/or Hearing Set SCU Thu 06/29 10:02 AM
Notice of Hearing Re:1 Complaint. Continued Pre-Trial Hearing Set for 08/15/2017 at 10:00 AM by Telephone Hearing. (dda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2017
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Wed 06/21 9:17 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:15 Order Re: Application of FRCP 26 (dda). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Wed 06/21 9:17 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:14 Notice of Hearing Re:1 Complaint. Trial Set for 10/16/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom #3, Portland. (dda). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2017
15 15 order Application of FRCP 26 Mon 06/19 3:57 PM
Order Re: Application of FRCP 26 (dda)
Related: [-]
14 14 court Notice of and/or Hearing Set SCU Mon 06/19 3:55 PM
Notice of Hearing Re:1 Complaint. Trial Set for 10/16/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom #3, Portland. (dda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2017
13 13 court Record of Proceeding (Hearing Held) Mon 06/19 3:53 PM
Hearing Held Re:1 Complaint (dda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
12 12 notice Notice Wed 06/07 7:54 PM
Notice DEBTOR'S NOTICE OF SECTION 329 STATEMENT Re:1 Complaint Filed By Carl Maxwell Joseph, Janis Lynn Joseph (ADAMS, ALEXZANDER)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2017
11 11 notice Notice Mon 06/05 4:07 PM
Notice DEBTOR'S NOTICE OF SECTION 329 STATEMENT Re:1 Complaint Filed By Carl Maxwell Joseph, Janis Lynn Joseph (ADAMS, ALEXZANDER)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 04, 2017
10 10 cmp Summons Service Executed Sun 06/04 10:43 PM
Summons Served on Cellco Partnership 5/4/2017; Cellco Partnership 5/4/2017; Cellco Partnership dba Verizon Wireless 5/4/2017; Verizon Wireless 5/4/2017; Verizon Wireless Bkcy Admin 5/4/2017 (ADAMS, ALEXZANDER)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice Sun 06/04 10:36 PM
Notice DEBTOR'S NOTICE OF SECTION 329 STATEMENT Re:1 Complaint Filed By Carl Maxwell Joseph, Janis Lynn Joseph (ADAMS, ALEXZANDER)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 03, 2017
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Sat 06/03 9:22 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:4 Scheduling Order (tlh). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2017
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 06/01 10:37 PM
Summons Served on Cellco Partnership 5/4/2017; Cellco Partnership dba Verizon Wireless 5/4/2017; Verizon Wireless Bkcy Admin 5/4/2017 (ADAMS, ALEXZANDER)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 06/01 10:30 PM
Superseded by Docket #7 : Summons Served on Cellco Partnership 5/4/2017; Cellco Partnership dba Verizon Wireless 5/4/2017; Verizon Wireless Bkcy Admin 5/4/2017 (ADAMS, ALEXZANDER) Modified on 6/2/2017 (cmr)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice Thu 06/01 9:37 PM
Notice OF SECTION 329 STATEMENT Re:1 Complaint Filed By Carl Maxwell Joseph, Janis Lynn Joseph (ADAMS, ALEXZANDER)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Scheduling Order Thu 06/01 3:11 PM
Scheduling Order (tlh)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/01 12:45 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Cellco Partnership dba Verizon Wireless (SOLOMON, TIMOTHY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued (or Alias) Tue 05/02 11:58 AM
Summons Issued for service on Cellco Partnership dba Verizon Wireless Date Issued 5/2/2017, Answer Due 6/1/20171 Complaint Pre-Trial Hearing Set for 06/13/2017 at 10:00 AM in/by Telephone Hearing. Scheduling Order due 06/16/2017. (tlh)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/28 12:46 PM
Adversary case 17-03059 Complaint by Carl Maxwell Joseph, Janis Lynn Joseph against Cellco Partnership dba Verizon Wireless, Cellco Partnership, Verizon Wireless Bkcy Admin. Filing Fee Exempt. Nature of Suit:(71 (Injunctive relief - reinstatement of stay))(ADAMS, ALEXZANDER)
Related: [-]