Dolat Ventures, Inc. v. VStock Transfer LLC et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Allyne R Ross |
Referred: | Cheryl L Pollak |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02542 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation |
Case Filed: | Apr 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 10, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 25, 2017 5:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
Park Ave Discoveries
375 Park Avenue Suite 2607
New York, NY 10152 |
|
Defendant
Eugene Larkin
|
|
Defendant
Austin Williams Mathews
|
|
Defendant
Mazel Property Enterprise Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bernard McDonnell
|
|
Defendant
John McDonnell
|
|
Defendant
John McEneaney
|
|
Defendant
Neil McGeown
|
|
Defendant
Benjamin Neuman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Barry Oliver
|
|
Defendant
Nechama Kuravkiy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kieran Phillips
|
|
Defendant
Colm Reilly
|
|
Defendant
Elimelech Rosenblat
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Maurice Ryan
|
|
Defendant
Sam Schlesinger
|
|
Defendant
Rivie Schwebel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
VStock Transfer LLC
|
|
Defendant
Noel Watters
|
|
Defendant
Steve Watters
|
|
Defendant
Gerard Valentine Kelly
|
|
Defendant
Glenn S Bordoff
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Adam Braun
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Cantwell
|
|
Defendant
John Carmody
|
|
Defendant
Chabad of North Hollywood
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carmel Clarke
|
|
Defendant
Cathal Clarke
|
|
Defendant
Colm Reilly Northern Capital
|
|
Defendant
Roger Conan
|
|
Defendant
Aidan Donnelly
|
|
Defendant
G. Watters Pension Trust
|
|
Defendant
J&M Family Foundation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Kerr Pension Trust
|
|
Plaintiff
Dolat Ventures, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Dermot Finnan
Terminated: 10/03/2017
|
|
Defendant
Stephen Hamilton
Terminated: 10/03/2017
|
|
Defendant
Hillel Isseroff
Terminated: 10/03/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 01/10 3:34 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE voluntary dismissal without prejudice.( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross, undated ). (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 01/09 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dolat Ventures, Inc. Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Fidler, Roger) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice(Other)
Mon 12/04 11:04 AM
NOTICE: Any defendants wishing to file a motion to dismiss on subject-matter jurisdiction and/or arbitration should file their briefs electronically with the court on or before January 10, 2018. Plaintiff should file its opposition brief electronically with the court on or before February 7, 2018. Defendants should file their reply briefs, if any, by February 16, 2018. The court anticipates that if any limited discovery is necessary on the issue of plaintiff's citizenship, such discovery can be accomplished very quickly. If, however, a party or parties believe a modification of the briefing schedule is necessary in light of any limited discovery, they should file a letter with the court explaining their views. (Clark, Sarah) |
||
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 11/21 11:33 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in person initial conference will be held at 12:30 Noon on 2/9/2018 in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file the same with the Court no later than two (2) days before 2/9/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/21/2017. (Manson, Eddie) |
|
40 | 40
3
pgs
misc
Letter
Tue 11/21 11:30 AM
Letter re Sequence of Determination of Threshold Issues by J&M Family Foundation, Inc., Benjamin Neuman (Hertzberg, Gabriel) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 11/17 11:29 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by Dolat Ventures, Inc.. (Fidler, Roger) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Market Prices, | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Exhibit Exhibit B Annual Report, | ||
Att: 3 16 pgs Exhibit Exhibit C Shareholder List, | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit Exhibit D List of Shares Held, | ||
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit Exhibit E Shares Held After Reverse | ||
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice(Other)
Thu 11/09 5:20 PM
NOTICE: Defendants J&M Family Foundation and Benjamin Neuman have asked to file an additional letter regarding the sequencing of motion practice. Those defendants (and any others wishing to be heard on this issue) shall file their letter(s) within three business days of the filing of the amended complaint. If plaintiff wishes to respond to these letters, it shall do so within three business days of the defendants' letter(s). (Clark, Sarah) |
||
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Letter
Wed 11/08 4:50 PM
Letter in Response to ECF 37 by J&M Family Foundation, Inc., Benjamin Neuman (Hertzberg, Gabriel) |
|
37 | 37
respoth
Reply in Opposition
Wed 11/08 7:38 AM
REPLY in Opposition Letter Memorandum filed by Dolat Ventures, Inc.. (Fidler, Roger) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Letter
Mon 11/06 1:49 PM
Letter in Clarification of Arbitrability and Arbitration Demand by Glenn S Bordoff, Adam Braun, Chabad of North Hollywood, Nechama Kuravkiy, Mazel Property Enterprise Corp., Elimelech Rosenblat (Harrison, Joseph) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Letter
Fri 11/03 5:17 PM
Letter re Arbitration Applicability per 10/31 Conference by Glenn S Bordoff, Adam Braun, Chabad of North Hollywood, Nechama Kuravkiy, Mazel Property Enterprise Corp., Elimelech Rosenblat (Harrison, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Consulting Agreements | ||
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
3
pgs
misc
Letter
Wed 11/01 6:43 PM
Letter re Sequence of Determination of Threshold Issues (CORRECTED) by J&M Family Foundation, Inc., Benjamin Neuman (Hertzberg, Gabriel) |
|
33 | 33
3
pgs
misc
Letter
Wed 11/01 6:15 PM
Letter re Sequence of Determination of Threshold Issues by J&M Family Foundation, Inc., Benjamin Neuman (Hertzberg, Gabriel) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 11/01 11:55 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Allyne R. Ross: Status Conference held on 10/31/2017. See for details. (Court Reporter Anthony Mancuso.) (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 10/26 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: A telephonic pre-motion conference will be held at 2:00 PM EST on Tuesday, October 31, 2017. Mr. Hertzberg is directed to initiate the call to Mr. Harrison, Mr. Fidler, and Mr. Feldman. When all parties are on the line, they should call chambers at 718-613-2380. (Clark, Sarah) |
||
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
5
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Opposition
Mon 10/16 11:57 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fidler, Roger) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-6-3-17 Quarterly Report, | ||
Att: 2 11 pgs Exhibit B-Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 7 pgs Exhibit C-Cox and Hazen-Law of Corporations | ||
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Parties
Tue 10/03 2:22 PM
Order Dismissing Parties: The claims against defendants Hillel Isseroff, Dermot Finnan, and Stephen Hamilton are dismissed. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) requires plaintiff to serve domestic defendants within 90 days of filing the complaint. That deadline passed on July 27, 2017. In addition, plaintiff failed to respond to the court's September 26, 2017 order to show cause why these claims should not be dismissed. The claims against these three defendants are therefore dismissed without prejudice. Party Hillel Isseroff, Dermot Finnan and Stephen Hamilton terminated. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 10/3/2017. (Clark, Sarah) |
||
notice
Notice(Other)
Tue 10/03 2:23 PM
NOTICE: Multiple defendants have submitted requests to bring motions to dismiss (10 ,29 ). Plaintiff is ordered to file a responsive letter of no more than seven pages addressing the legal and factual bases of the anticipated motions by October 16, 2017. Plaintiff should also treat5 as a request to file a motion to dismiss and should respond to the legal and factual bases of that potential motion in the same letter. (Clark, Sarah) |
||
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 09/26 12:42 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is ordered to show cause why its claims against domestic defendants Hillel Isseroff, Dermot Finnan, and Stephen Hamilton should not be dismissed. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) requires plaintiff to serve domestic defendants within 90 days of filing the complaint. Over 60 days have passed since that deadline. On or before September 29, 2017, plaintiff is ordered to either file proof of service for these defendants or show good cause for its failure. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 9/26/2017. (Clark, Sarah) |
||
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 09/11 9:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Isaac Harrison on behalf of Glenn S Bordoff, Adam Braun, Chabad of North Hollywood, Nechama Kuravkiy, Mazel Property Enterprise Corp., Elimelech Rosenblat (aty to be noticed) (Harrison, Joseph) |
|
29 | 29
2
pgs
misc
Letter
Mon 09/11 9:23 PM
Letter Requesting Pre-Motion Conference by Glenn S Bordoff, Adam Braun, Chabad of North Hollywood, Nechama Kuravkiy, Mazel Property Enterprise Corp., Elimelech Rosenblat (Harrison, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 09/05 4:51 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Marziliano, August) |
||
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Tue 08/22 11:25 AM
ORDER re26 Answer to Complaint filed by Park Ave Discoveries. Defendant Park Ave Discoveries may not answer the complaint pro se . An entity may not appear in a lawsuit except through an attorney. See United States ex rel. Mergent Servs. v. Flaherty , 540 F.3d 89, 92 (2d Cir. 2008) ("It is well established that a layman may not represent a corporation even if the sole shareholder."); Grace v. Bank Leumi Trust Co. of N.Y. , 443 F.3d 180, 192 (2d Cir. 2006). Therefore, Park Ave Discoveries is ordered to appear by counsel. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 8/22/2017. (Matsumura, Rebecca) |
||
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice(Other)
Mon 08/14 10:07 AM
NOTICE. The court has received28 letter request for a pre-motion conference. Per my earlier rulings, all pre-motion letters will be considered once all defendants have had an opportunity to respond to the complaint. (Matsumura, Rebecca) |
||
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
2
pgs
misc
Letter
Fri 08/11 6:37 PM
Letter Requesting Pre-Motion Conference by Glenn S Bordoff, Adam Braun, Nechama Kuravkiy, Mazel Property Enterprise Corp., Elimelech Rosenblat (Harrison, Joseph) |
|
27 | 27
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/11 6:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Isaac Harrison on behalf of Glenn S Bordoff, Adam Braun, Nechama Kuravkiy, Mazel Property Enterprise Corp., Elimelech Rosenblat (aty to be noticed) (Harrison, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/11 9:05 AM
ANSWER Response to1 Complaint, by Steven Rosenfeld on behalf of Park Ave Discoveries. (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
25 | 25
2
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 08/10 12:34 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Dolat Ventures, Inc.. (Fidler, Roger) |
|
24 | 24
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/10 12:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dolat Ventures, Inc.. VStock Transfer LLC served on 6/26/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Fidler, Roger) |
|
23 | 23
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/10 12:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dolat Ventures, Inc.. Sam Schlesinger served on 6/24/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Fidler, Roger) |
|
22 | 22
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/10 12:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dolat Ventures, Inc.. Elimelech Rosenblat served on 6/26/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Fidler, Roger) |
|
21 | 21
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/10 12:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dolat Ventures, Inc.. Benjamin Neuman served on 6/27/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Fidler, Roger) |
|
20 | 20
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/10 12:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dolat Ventures, Inc.. Maurice Ryan served on 6/24/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Fidler, Roger) |
|
19 | 19
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/10 12:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dolat Ventures, Inc.. Nechama Kuravkiy served on 6/27/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Fidler, Roger) |
|
18 | 18
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/10 12:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dolat Ventures, Inc.. John Carmody served on 6/24/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Fidler, Roger) |
|
17 | 17
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/10 12:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dolat Ventures, Inc.. Chabad of North Hollywood served on 7/7/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Fidler, Roger) |
|
16 | 16
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 08/10 12:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dolat Ventures, Inc.. John Kerr Pension Trust waiver sent on 5/8/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Fidler, Roger) |
|
15 | 15
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 08/10 12:05 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dolat Ventures, Inc.. Roger Conan waiver sent on 5/8/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Fidler, Roger) |
|
14 | 14
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 08/10 12:03 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dolat Ventures, Inc.. Cathal Clarke waiver sent on 5/8/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Fidler, Roger) |
|
13 | 13
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 08/10 12:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dolat Ventures, Inc.. Carmel Clarke waiver sent on 5/8/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Fidler, Roger) |
|
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 08/10 11:53 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dolat Ventures, Inc.. Aidan Donnelly waiver sent on 5/8/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Fidler, Roger) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 08/10 1:33 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Answers now due September 11, 2017 . The court will defer consideration of the pre-motion letters already filed until September 11, 2017. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 8/10/2017. (Matsumura, Rebecca) |
||
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 07/12 1:40 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Responses to complaint now due August 11, 2017. On or before August 11, 2017, plaintiff shall also file proof of service of the complaint on all defendants who have not yet appeared by counsel as of that date. The court defers consideration of pre-motion letters already filed until August 11, 2017. This schedule may be altered only with permission from the court. Plaintiff is ordered to serve a copy of this order on all defendants who have not yet appeared by counsel. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 7/12/2017. (Matsumura, Rebecca) |
||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 07/12 11:49 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer requesting a thirty day extension of time to find an attorney/and or file a response to complaint by Nechama Kuravkiy, Mazel Property Enterprise Corp., Elimelech Rosenblat. (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice(Other)
Wed 07/05 9:13 AM
NOTICE re10 request for a pre-motion conference. Per my June 16 and June 20, 2017 orders, the court will not consider motions to dismiss the complaint until all defendants have been served. Therefore, plaintiff need not respond to10 until further order by the court. (Matsumura, Rebecca) |
||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
misc
Letter
Thu 06/29 4:53 PM
Letter Requesting Pre-Motion Conference Regarding Fed.R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and (b)(6) Motion by J&M Family Foundation, Inc., Benjamin Neuman (Hertzberg, Gabriel) |
|
Att: 1 8 pgs Exhibit -A, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit -B | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/29 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel Hertzberg on behalf of J&M Family Foundation, Inc., Benjamin Neuman (aty to be noticed) (Hertzberg, Gabriel) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Tue 06/20 9:36 AM
ORDER By7 letter, plaintiff has requested an additional three weeks to serve defendants. Plaintiff indicated that it sought waivers of service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d). With respect to those defendants residing outside of the United States, a response to plaintiffs request would not be due until June 26, 2017. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d)(1)(F). Therefore, plaintiffs request is granted. Plaintiff is ordered to serve all defendants with its complaint and a copy of this order on or before July 7, 2017. . Any defendant, or group of defendants, who would like to be heard on a motion to dismiss, shall file a pre motion letter in accordance with my individual rules of practice on or before July 21, 2017. These deadlines may only be altered with permission from the court. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 6/20/2017. (Matsumura, Rebecca) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
3
pgs
misc
Letter
Mon 06/19 6:12 PM
Letter Response by Rivie Schwebel (Feldman, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
misc
Letter
Mon 06/19 9:49 AM
Letter by Dolat Ventures, Inc. (Fidler, Roger) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Fri 06/16 9:53 AM
ORDER. The court is in receipt of defendant Rivie Schwebel's6 letter, alleging that any delay in addressing his motion to dismiss will cause unspecified "continued and irreparable losses." However, the other thirty-six defendants in this action have not been served. Addressing Mr. Schwebel's motion at this juncture, particularly without a pre-motion conference and when plaintiff has had no opportunity to amend its complaint, all but guarantees that there will be several rounds of briefing on motions to dismiss. To preserve the resources of the court and the parties, the court will not move forward on any motion to dismiss until all defendants are served. Therefore, plaintiff is ordered to serve all remaining defendants on or before June 20, 2017. . Any defendant, or group of defendants, who would like to be heard on a motion to dismiss, shall file a pre motion letter in accordance with my individual rules of practice on or before June 27, 2017. These deadlines may be altered only with permission from the court.Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 6/16/2017. (Matsumura, Rebecca) |
||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
misc
Letter
Thu 06/15 10:03 AM
Letter by Rivie Schwebel (Feldman, Steven) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 06/15 8:35 AM
ORDER dismissing5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; dismissing5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Judge Ross's individual rules of practice, defendants may not bring this motion without the court's permission. Defendants are directed to file a letter requesting a pre-motion conference in accordance with Judge Ross's individual rules. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 6/15/2017. (Matsumura, Rebecca) |
||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
20
pgs
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 06/14 6:28 PM
First Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Rivie Schwebel. (Feldman, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit C | ||
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
37
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Mon 05/01 11:54 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Fri 04/28 3:06 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Fri 04/28 3:05 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/28 10:26 AM
COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9485746 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Dolat Ventures, Inc.. (Fidler, Roger) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Adam Braun, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Aidan Donnelly, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Austin Williams Mathews, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons Barry Oliver, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons Benjamin Neuman, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons Bernard McDonnell, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Summons Carmel Clake, | ||
Att: 9 Proposed Summons Cathal Clarke, | ||
Att: 10 Proposed Summons Chabad of North Hollywod, | ||
Att: 11 Proposed Summons Colm Reilly Northern Capital, | ||
Att: 12 Proposed Summons Colm Reilly, | ||
Att: 13 Proposed Summons David Cantwell, | ||
Att: 14 Proposed Summons Dermot Finnan, | ||
Att: 15 Proposed Summons Elimelech Rosenblat, | ||
Att: 16 Proposed Summons Eugene Larkin, | ||
Att: 17 Proposed Summons G. Watters Pension Trust, | ||
Att: 18 Proposed Summons Gerard Valentine Kelly, | ||
Att: 19 Proposed Summons Glenn S. Bordoff, | ||
Att: 20 Proposed Summons Hillel Isseroff, | ||
Att: 21 Proposed Summons J&M Family Foundation, Inc., | ||
Att: 22 Proposed Summons John Carmody, | ||
Att: 23 Proposed Summons John Kerr Pension Trust, | ||
Att: 24 Proposed Summons John McDonnell, | ||
Att: 25 Proposed Summons John McEneaney, | ||
Att: 26 Proposed Summons Kieran Phillips, | ||
Att: 27 Proposed Summons Maurice Ryan, | ||
Att: 28 Proposed Summons Mazel Property Enterprise Corp., | ||
Att: 29 Proposed Summons Nechama Kuravkiy, | ||
Att: 30 Proposed Summons Neil McGeown, | ||
Att: 31 Proposed Summons Noel Watters, | ||
Att: 32 Proposed Summons Park Ave Discoveries, | ||
Att: 33 1 pgs Proposed Summons Rivie Schwebel, | ||
Att: 34 Proposed Summons Roger Conan, | ||
Att: 35 Proposed Summons Sam Schlesinger, | ||
Att: 36 Proposed Summons Stephen Hamilton, | ||
Att: 37 Proposed Summons Steve Watters, | ||
Att: 38 Proposed Summons VStock Transfer LLC, | ||
Att: 39 2 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 40 7 pgs Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 41 16 pgs Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 42 2 pgs Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 43 3 pgs Exhibit Exhibit E | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/28 3:07 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |