Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-32660

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:17-bk-32669
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2017
Terminated:Sep 29, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Ameriforge Corporation
945 Bunker Hill Road Suite 500
Houston, TX 77024
Represented By
Patricia Baron Tomasco
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Last checked: Friday Oct 20, 2017 7:19 AM CDT
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Hector Duran
U.S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago
Monday, January 22, 2024
9 9 trustee Remark (batch) Mon 01/22 1:55 PM
Remark: Judge Christopher M. Lopez randomly reassigned and added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated . (DawnaKelly)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2017
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 10/17 9:41 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (ltie)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2017
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/05 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/05/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Thursday, May 04, 2017
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/05 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/04/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order on Motion For Joint Administration
Wednesday, May 03, 2017
5 5 1 pgs order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists Wed 05/03 6:30 AM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2017
6 6 misc Declaration Wed 05/03 1:36 PM
Declaration re: Electronic Filing (Filed By Ameriforge Corporation ) Related [+] (than)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
4 4 court Document Tue 05/02 10:38 AM
An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Texas directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Ameriforge Group Inc., Case No. 17-32660 230 Bodwell Corporation, Case No. 17-32661 Advanced Joining Technologies, Inc., Case No. 17-32662 AF Gloenco Inc., Case No. 17-32663 AFG Brazil Holdings LLC, Case 7 No. 17-32664 AFG Brazil LLC, Case No. 17-32665 AFG Louisiana Holdings Inc, Case No. 17-32667 Allpoints Oilfield Services LLC, Case No. 17-32668 Ameriforge Corporation, Case No. 17-32669 Ameriforge Cuming Insulation LLC, Case No. 17-32670 Century Corrosion Technologies LLC, Case No. 17-32671 Cuming Corporation, Case No. 17-32672 Dynafab Acquisitions Corp., Case No. 17-32673 Flotation Technologies LLC, Case No. 17-32674 FR AFG Holdings, Inc., Case No. 17-32675 NRG Manufacturing Louisiana LLC, Case No. 17-32678 NRG Manufacturing Inc, Case No. 17-32676 Steel Industries Inc., Case No. 17-32679 Steel Industries Real Estate Holding LLC, Case No. 17-32680 and Taper-Lok Corporation, Case No. 17-32682 All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 17-32660 (DRJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2017
3 3 order Order for Joint Administration Tue 05/02 10:11 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Related [+] Signed on 5/1/2017. (aalo)
Related: [-] 2
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 05/01 9:46 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Hector Duran (Duran, Hector)
Related: [-]
court Case Reassigned Tue 05/02 10:21 AM
Judge David R Jones added to case. Involvement of Judge Marvin Isgur Terminated (aalo)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 30, 2017
2 2 motion Joint Administration Sun 04/30 10:09 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Ameriforge Corporation (Tomasco, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint A -- Proposed Order
1 1 20 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Sun 04/30 7:56 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Ameriforge Corporation. (Tomasco, Patricia)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Sun 04/30 7:57 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-32669 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18963241. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]