Ameriforge Cuming Insulation LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-32660
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-32660
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-32670 |
Case Filed: | Apr 30, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 29, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Ameriforge Cuming Insulation LLC
945 Bunker Hill Rd Ste 500
Houston, TX 77024-1363 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago |
Monday, January 22, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
trustee
Remark (batch)
Mon 01/22 1:55 PM
Remark: Judge Christopher M. Lopez randomly reassigned and added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated . (DawnaKelly) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 10/17 9:42 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (ltie) |
||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Withdrawal of Claim: 1 Filed by Louisiana Department of Revenue (Jarreau, Bridget) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/05/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/04/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Declaration re: (Filed By Ameriforge Cuming Insulation LLC ) (than) |
|
4 | 4
court
Document
Tue 05/02 10:38 AM
An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Texas directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Ameriforge Group Inc., Case No. 17-32660 230 Bodwell Corporation, Case No. 17-32661 Advanced Joining Technologies, Inc., Case No. 17-32662 AF Gloenco Inc., Case No. 17-32663 AFG Brazil Holdings LLC, Case 7 No. 17-32664 AFG Brazil LLC, Case No. 17-32665 AFG Louisiana Holdings Inc, Case No. 17-32667 Allpoints Oilfield Services LLC, Case No. 17-32668 Ameriforge Corporation, Case No. 17-32669 Ameriforge Cuming Insulation LLC, Case No. 17-32670 Century Corrosion Technologies LLC, Case No. 17-32671 Cuming Corporation, Case No. 17-32672 Dynafab Acquisitions Corp., Case No. 17-32673 Flotation Technologies LLC, Case No. 17-32674 FR AFG Holdings, Inc., Case No. 17-32675 NRG Manufacturing Louisiana LLC, Case No. 17-32678 NRG Manufacturing Inc, Case No. 17-32676 Steel Industries Inc., Case No. 17-32679 Steel Industries Real Estate Holding LLC, Case No. 17-32680 and Taper-Lok Corporation, Case No. 17-32682 All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 17-32660 (DRJ) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Signed on 5/1/2017. (aalo) |
|
trustee
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 05/01 9:47 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Hector Duran (Duran, Hector) |
||
court
Case Reassigned
Tue 05/02 10:22 AM
Judge David R Jones added to case. Involvement of Judge Marvin Isgur Terminated (aalo) |
||
Sunday, April 30, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Ameriforge Cuming Insulation LLC (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Ameriforge Cuming Insulation LLC. (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
crditcrd
none
Sun 04/30 8:01 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-32670 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18963247. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |