California Eastern District Court
Judge:Lawrence J O'Neill
Referred: Jennifer L Thurston
Case #: 1:17-cv-00608
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2017
Terminated:Feb 13, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 25, 2017 3:20 AM PDT
Defendant
FMC Technologies Measurement Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel C Whang
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Pantea Lili Ahmadi
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
Technip USA Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel C Whang
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Pantea Lili Ahmadi
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
Technip USA, Inc
Represented By
Daniel C Whang
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Pantea Lili Ahmadi
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
Technipfmc US Holdings LLC
Represented By
Daniel C Whang
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Pantea Lili Ahmadi
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ron Messick
Represented By
Karl Gerber
Employment Lawyers Group
contact info
Marine Khachoyan
Employment Lawyers Group
contact info

GPO Jun 05 2017
Order Granting stipulation to allow Plaintiff to file an First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/5/2017. ( Amended Complaint due by 6/12/2017) (Rosales, O)
GPO Jul 28 2017
SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/27/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 10/24/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 6/1/2018; Expert 8/17/2018. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 2/20/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 8/31/2018; Hearing by 9/28/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 10/12/2018; Hearing by 11/21/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 3/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
GPO Jan 30 2018
ORDER APPROVING PAGA SETTLEMENT, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/29/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
GPO Feb 13 2018
JUDGMENT signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 02/13/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)

Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, February 13, 2018
26 26 17 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 02/13 11:03 AM
JUDGMENT signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 02/13/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2018
25 25 misc Proposed Order Fri 02/09 4:31 PM
PROPOSED ORDER re Judgment by FMC Technologies Measurement Solutions, Inc., Technip USA Holdings, Inc., Technip USA, Inc, Technipfmc US Holdings LLC. (Whang, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
24 24 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/30 10:34 AM
ORDER APPROVING PAGA SETTLEMENT, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/29/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2018
23 23 misc Declaration Thu 01/25 5:31 PM
DECLARATION of Karl Gerber re22 Stipulation.(Guleser, Ann)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
22 22 misc Stipulation Thu 01/25 5:27 PM
STIPULATION re: settlement and release of PAGA claims by Ron Messick. Attorney Guleser, Ann Benin added.(Guleser, Ann)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed order Re: Settlement and Release of PAGA Claims
Friday, July 28, 2017
21 21 order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 07/28 8:49 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/27/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 10/24/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 6/1/2018; Expert 8/17/2018. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 2/20/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 8/31/2018; Hearing by 9/28/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 10/12/2018; Hearing by 11/21/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 3/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2017
20 20 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 07/27 9:52 AM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 7/27/2017. Case SCHEDULED; Court to issue Scheduling Order. Plaintiffs Counsel Karl Gerber (telephonic) present. Defendants Counsel Daniel Whang (telephonic) present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO/FTR- Hall. (Hall, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2017
19 19 misc Scheduling Report Thu 07/20 12:01 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by FMC Technologies Measurement Solutions, Inc., Technip USA Holdings, Inc., Technip USA, Inc, Technipfmc US Holdings LLC. (Whang, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2017
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 06/20 11:30 AM
ANSWER by FMC Technologies Measurement Solutions, Inc., Technip USA Holdings, Inc., Technip USA, Inc, Technipfmc US Holdings LLC.(Whang, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2017
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 06/06 6:30 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Ron Messick.(Khachoyan, Marine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Monday, June 05, 2017
16 16 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Mon 06/05 3:18 PM
Order Granting stipulation to allow Plaintiff to file an First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/5/2017. ( Amended Complaint due by 6/12/2017) (Rosales, O)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2017
15 15 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 06/02 6:23 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Plaintiff by Ron Messick. Attorney Khachoyan, Marine added.(Khachoyan, Marine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, May 10, 2017
14 14 misc Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge Wed 05/10 4:32 PM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by FMC Technologies Measurement Solutions, Inc., Technip USA Holdings, Inc., Technip USA, Inc, Technipfmc US Holdings LLC. Attorney Ahmadi, Pantea Lili added. (Ahmadi, Pantea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2017
13 13 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Wed 05/03 3:56 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Ron Messick: Amended10 Jury Demand. (Gerber, Karl)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Wed 05/03 3:53 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Ron Messick: Amended11 Amended Document. (Gerber, Karl)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Wed 05/03 12:20 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Ron Messick: Amended9 Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Gerber, Karl)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Jury Demand Wed 05/03 12:15 PM
DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Ron Messick.(Gerber, Karl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service POS
9 9 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge Wed 05/03 11:51 AM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ron Messick.(Gerber, Karl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service POS
Monday, May 01, 2017
8 8 service Certificate of Service Mon 05/01 2:38 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by FMC Technologies Measurement Solutions, Inc., Technip USA Holdings, Inc., Technip USA, Inc re7 Civil New Case Documents for LJO,. (Whang, Daniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Civil New Case Documents for LJO Mon 05/01 12:10 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Marrujo, C)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
Friday, April 28, 2017
6 6 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by FMC Technologies Measurement Solutions, Inc., Technip USA Holdings, Inc., Technip USA, Inc, Technipfmc US Holdings LLC re3 Declaration,4 Declaration,2 Declaration,5 Notice - Other,1 Notice of Removal,. (Whang, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE of Defendants' Corporate Disclosure Statement by FMC Technologies Measurement Solutions, Inc., Technip USA Holdings, Inc., Technip USA, Inc, Technipfmc US Holdings LLC re1 Notice of Removal,. (Whang, Daniel)
Related: [-]
4 4 DECLARATION of Daniel Whang re1 Notice of Removal,. (Whang, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 DECLARATION of Sherry Savoia re1 Notice of Removal,. (Whang, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 DECLARATION of Jeffrey D. Palmer re1 Notice of Removal,. (Whang, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-17-100556 by Technip USA, Inc, FMC Technologies Measurement Solutions, Inc., Technipfmc US Holdings LLC, Technip USA Holdings, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7038924)(Whang, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet