Burgess v. Appalachian Regional Law School et al
Virginia Western District Court | |
Judge: | James P Jones |
Referred: | Pamela Meade Sargent |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00015 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex) |
Case Filed: | May 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 28, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 12/19/2023 11:59 PM EST |
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 07/28 12:30 PM
ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 7/28/17. (flc) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Fri 07/28 9:50 AM
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Jury Trial set for 6/11/18 thru 6/15/18 at 9:00 a.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones (No Interpreter requested) (Cancel Court Reporter) (flc) Modified on 7/28/2017 TO correct trial ending date to 6/15/18(flc) |
|
24 | 24
minutes
Settlement Conference
Fri 07/28 9:32 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Settlement Conference held on 7/27/2017. Compromise Settlement reached. Final Order may be entered. (PMS) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 07/25 4:04 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 8/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/25/17. (ejs) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 07/24 2:31 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Necessary Party by Appalachian Regional Law School, Patricia Deel, Sandra Keen McGlothlin, Jina Sauls.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent.(Loughlin, Rachael) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
8
pgs
respm
Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
Fri 07/21 11:10 AM
Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Necessary Party . filed by Hillary Lynne Burgess. (Strelka, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Minute Order
Thu 07/20 2:46 PM
Minute Order. The case is referred to the Honorable Pamela Meade Sargent for mediation proceedings.Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 7/20/2017. (JPJ) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order Setting Settlement Conference
Thu 07/20 11:20 AM
Order Setting Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 7/27/2017 09:30 AM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. Written statements due 7/26/2017 and may be emailed to chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 07/20/2017. (Bordwine, Robin) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 07/20 11:18 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: (N) Settlement Conference set for 7/27/2017 09:30 AM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Bordwine, Robin) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 07/19 12:32 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/11/2018 thru 6/15/2018 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. . Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/19/17. (ejs) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
Settlement Conference
Tue 07/18 2:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Settlement Conference held by telephone conference call with Counsel Thomas Strelka and Mago on 7/18/2017. Jury trial set before J. Jones in Abingdon 6/11-15/18. Scheduling Order forthcoming. (PMS) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/14 1:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Luzietti Loughlin on behalf of All Defendants (Loughlin, Rachael) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 07/14 12:40 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL REGARDING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: (N) Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2017 02:00 PM by telephone conference call before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Bordwine, Robin) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 07/12 3:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss8 . Responses due by 7/31/2017 Replies due by 8/7/2017. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/7/2017.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/12/17. (PMS) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 07/11 12:18 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Hillary Lynne Burgess.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Strelka, Thomas) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Brief / Memorandum in Support
Fri 07/07 5:50 PM
Brief / Memorandum in Support re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Necessary Party . filed by Appalachian Regional Law School, Patricia Deel, Sandra Keen McGlothlin, Jina Sauls.(Mago, Vijay) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss
Fri 07/07 5:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Necessary Party by Appalachian Regional Law School, Patricia Deel, Sandra Keen McGlothlin, Jina Sauls.(Mago, Vijay) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
32
pgs
respm
Brief / Memorandum in Support
Fri 07/07 5:37 PM
Brief / Memorandum in Support re8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Appalachian Regional Law School, Patricia Deel, Sandra Keen McGlothlin, Jina Sauls. (Mago, Vijay) |
|
8 | 8
3
pgs
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 07/07 5:35 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Appalachian Regional Law School, Patricia Deel, Sandra Keen McGlothlin, Jina Sauls.(Mago, Vijay) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 05/08 4:28 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jina Sauls, Patricia Deel, Appalachian Regional Law School, Sandra Keen McGlothlin. All Defendants.(Mago, Vijay) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 05/02 12:36 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Patricia Deel NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (lml) |
|
5 | 5
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 05/02 12:33 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Sandra Keen McGlothlin NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (lml) |
|
4 | 4
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 05/02 12:27 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Sandra Keen McGlothlin, Interim Dean NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (lml) |
|
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 05/02 12:19 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Jina Sauls NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (lml) |
|
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 05/02 12:15 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Appalachian Regional Law School NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (lml) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
62
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 05/02 11:57 AM
COMPLAINT against Appalachian Regional Law School, Patricia Deel, Sandra Keen McGlothlin, Jina Sauls (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, Receipt #0423-2664921, filed by Hillary Lynne Burgess. 70 Day Notice due by 7/10/2017 90 Day Service due by 7/31/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A EEOC Notice of Rights, #2 Exhibit B Appalachian School of Law Sexual Misconduct Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(lml) |