Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-30607

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Guy R Humphrey
Case #: 3:17-ap-03035
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 02, 2017
Terminated:Jun 16, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
NCP Finance Ohio, LLC
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP 1 South Main Street, Ste. 1300
Dayton, OH 45402
Represented By
NCP Finance Ohio, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald F Harker, III
2135 Miamisburg Centerville Rd.
Dayton, OH 45459
Represented By
Patricia J Friesinger
Coolidge Wall Co., L.P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, May 03, 2018
court Receipt for Filing Fee - Generic Thu 05/03 12:09 PM
Receipt for Filing Fee Receipt Number 3193376, Fee Amount $350.00 Related [+] (3cs)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Donald F Harker
Friday, June 16, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Fri 06/16 4:11 AM
Adversary Case 3:17-ap-3035 Closed (3ti)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2017
7 7 notice Notice of Dismissal (AP) Thu 06/15 2:16 AM
Notice of Dismissal (AP) Filed by Plaintiff Donald F Harker III. (Friesinger, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2017
6 6 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Fri 06/09 12:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 06/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)5 Order (Generic)
Monday, June 05, 2017
5 5 order Order (Generic) Tue 06/06 10:03 AM
Agreed Order To Extend The Time For Defendant To Move, Answer Or Otherwise Plead To Complaint To June 19, 2017 Re: Related [+]. (3ti) Modified text on 6/6/2017 (3ti)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Donald F Harker
Thursday, May 18, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/18 2:30 AM
Summons Service Executed on NCP Finance Ohio, LLC 5/10/2017 (Friesinger, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2017
3 3 misc Summons Issued and Served Fri 05/05 2:23 AM
Summons(es) on NCP Finance Ohio, LLC Issued On 5/5/2017, and Answer Due On 06/5/2017 (Friesinger, Patricia)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Summons Issued and Served Fri 05/05 1:17 AM
Summons(es) on NCP Finance Ohio, LLC Issued On 5/5/2017, and Answer Due On 06/5/2017 (Friesinger, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/02 2:49 AM
Adversary case 3:17-ap-03035. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Donald F Harker III against NCP Finance Ohio, LLC. Receipt Number defer, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred Complaint of Trustee to avoid and recover preference transfers and/or post-petition transfers pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 549, and 550; to disallow any and all proofs of claims filed or to be filed by defendant; and for costs, reasonable attorney fees and other relief (Friesinger, Patricia)
Related: [-]