Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-30607

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Guy R Humphrey
Case #: 3:17-ap-03037
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 02, 2017
Terminated:Jun 12, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Buckeye Credit Solutions LLC
4212 Linden Avenue
Dayton, OH 45432
Represented By
Buckeye Credit Solutions LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald F Harker, III
2135 Miamisburg Centerville Rd.
Dayton, OH 45459
Represented By
Patricia J Friesinger
Coolidge Wall Co., L.P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Thursday, May 03, 2018
court Receipt for Filing Fee - Generic Thu 05/03 12:11 PM
Receipt for Filing Fee Receipt Number 3193378, Fee Amount $350.00 Related [+] (3cs)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Donald F Harker
Monday, June 12, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Mon 06/12 4:19 AM
Adversary Case 3:17-ap-3037 Closed (3ti)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2017
9 9 notice Notice of Dismissal (AP) Thu 06/08 10:36 AM
Notice of Dismissal (AP) Filed by Plaintiff Donald F Harker III. (Friesinger, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
8 8 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Thu 06/08 12:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 06/07/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)7 Order to File
Friday, June 02, 2017
7 7 order File Mon 06/05 1:07 AM
Agreed Order To Extend The Time For Defendant To Move, Answer Or Otherwise Plead To Complaint To June 19, 2017. Answer Due: 6/19/2017. (3ti)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2017
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/18 2:29 AM
Summons Service Executed on Buckeye Credit Solutions LLC 5/11/2017 (Friesinger, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2017
5 5 misc Summons Issued and Served Fri 05/05 2:33 AM
Summons(es) on Buckeye Credit Solutions LLC Issued On 5/5/2017, and Answer Due On 06/5/2017 (Friesinger, Patricia)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Issued and Served Fri 05/05 2:32 AM
Summons(es) on Buckeye Credit Solutions LLC Issued On 5/5/2017, and Answer Due On 06/5/2017 (Friesinger, Patricia)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Summons Issued and Served Fri 05/05 1:21 AM
Summons(es) on Buckeye Credit Solutions LLC Issued On 5/5/2017, and Answer Due On 06/5/2017 (Friesinger, Patricia)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Summons Issued and Served Fri 05/05 1:21 AM
Summons(es) on Buckeye Credit Solutions LLC Issued On 5/5/2017, and Answer Due On 06/5/2017 (Friesinger, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/02 3:01 AM
Adversary case 3:17-ap-03037. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Donald F Harker III against Buckeye Credit Solutions LLC. Receipt Number defer, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred Complaint of Trustee to avoid and recover preference transfers and/or post-petition transfers pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 549, and 550; to disallow any and all proofs of claims filed or to be filed by defendant; and for costs, reasonable attorney fees and other relief (Friesinger, Patricia)
Related: [-]