Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-30607

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Guy R Humphrey
Case #: 3:17-ap-03038
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 02, 2017
Terminated:Jun 23, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Advance America Cash Advance Inc
5420 Springboro Pike
Moraine, OH 45439
Represented By
Advance America Cash Advance Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald F Harker, III
2135 Miamisburg Centerville Rd.
Dayton, OH 45459
Represented By
Patricia J Friesinger
Coolidge Wall Co., L.P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Thursday, May 03, 2018
court Receipt for Filing Fee - Generic Thu 05/03 12:13 PM
Receipt for Filing Fee Receipt Number 3193379, Fee Amount $350.00 Related [+] (3cs)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Donald F Harker
Friday, June 23, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Fri 06/23 11:24 AM
Adversary Case 3:17-ap-3038 Closed (3ti)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
9 9 notice Notice of Dismissal (AP) Wed 06/07 2:31 AM
Notice of Dismissal (AP) Filed by Plaintiff Donald F Harker III. (Friesinger, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2017
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/18 2:31 AM
Summons Service Executed on Advance America Cash Advance Inc 5/10/2017 (Friesinger, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2017
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 05/17 10:15 AM
Summons Service Executed on Advance America Cash Advance Inc 5/10/2017 (Friesinger, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2017
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 05/15 11:01 AM
Summons Service Executed on Advance America Cash Advance Inc 5/10/2017 (Friesinger, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2017
5 5 misc Summons Issued and Served Fri 05/05 2:35 AM
Summons(es) on Advance America Cash Advance Inc Issued On 5/5/2017, and Answer Due On 06/5/2017 (Friesinger, Patricia)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Issued and Served Fri 05/05 2:34 AM
Summons(es) on Advance America Cash Advance Inc Issued On 5/5/2017, and Answer Due On 06/5/2017 (Friesinger, Patricia)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Summons Issued and Served Fri 05/05 1:23 AM
Summons(es) on Advance America Cash Advance Inc Issued On 5/5/2017, and Answer Due On 06/5/2017 (Friesinger, Patricia)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Summons Issued and Served Fri 05/05 1:22 AM
Summons(es) on Advance America Cash Advance Inc Issued On 5/5/2017, and Answer Due On 06/5/2017 (Friesinger, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/02 3:06 AM
Adversary case 3:17-ap-03038. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Donald F Harker III against Advance America Cash Advance Inc. Receipt Number defer, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred Complaint of Trustee to avoid and recover preference transfers and/or post-petition transfers pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 549, and 550; to disallow any and all proofs of claims filed or to be filed by defendant; and for costs, reasonable attorney fees and other relief (Friesinger, Patricia)
Related: [-]