Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-03303
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 02, 2017
Terminated:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
New Millennium Research LLC
Represented By
New Millennium Research LLC
contact info
Defendant
Steven M. Stastny
Represented By
Steven M. Stastny
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Jennifer Tennile Langley
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Thursday, March 27, 2025
36 36 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Thu 03/27 1:37 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
35 35 court Certificate of Judgment for Registration in Another District Mon 11/18 2:37 PM
Certificate of Judgment for Registration in Another District Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)34 Letter filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
34 34 misc Letter Mon 11/18 2:36 PM
Letter Requesting Certificate of Judgment for Registration in Another District filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 16, 2021
33 33 order Directing Fri 07/16 11:06 AM
Garnishment Disposition Order Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)26 Garnishment Summons
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
32 32 court Hearing held Tue 06/08 2:43 PM
Hearing held; Garnishment Dismissed. Appearance(s): Brittany Falabella Related [+] (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)26 Garnishment Summons
Friday, May 07, 2021
30 30 misc Certificate of Service Fri 05/07 7:59 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by U.S. Marshal's Office. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)26 Garnishment Summons,27 Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
29 29 misc Certificate of Service Fri 05/07 7:57 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by U.S. Marshal's Office. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)26 Garnishment Summons,27 Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
28 28 court Hearing continued Tue 05/04 11:35 AM
Hearing continued; Appearance(s): Brittany Falabella Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 6/8/2021 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)26 Garnishment Summons
Monday, May 03, 2021
31 31 answer Answer Tue 05/11 10:42 AM
Answer -Garnishee's Answer Related [+] filed by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)26 Garnishment Summons
Friday, April 23, 2021
27 27 misc Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal Fri 04/23 10:33 AM
Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
26 26 summon Garnishment Summons (HDL) Fri 04/23 10:33 AM
Garnishment Summons; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 5/4/2021 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)25 Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
25 25 misc Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment Fri 04/23 10:32 AM
Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment -New Millennium Research LLC filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
24 24 order Directing Tue 06/30 2:04 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney; Cullen Drescher Speckhart terminated; Robert S. Westermann for Richard Arrowsmith added (Motion filed in 15-32919 (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2019
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/17 1:03 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 10, 2019
22 22 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Mon 03/11 1:26 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)21 Order Directing
Friday, March 08, 2019
21 21 order Directing Fri 03/08 5:00 PM
Garnishment Disposition Order Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Garnishment Summons
Thursday, February 28, 2019
20 20 court Hearing held Thu 02/28 11:09 AM
Hearing held; Relief Granted as set out in open court Related [+] Appearance: Franklin Cragle. (Oliver, Betty)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Garnishment Summons
Wednesday, January 30, 2019
19 19 answer Answer Thu 01/31 4:12 PM
Answer -Garnishee's Answer Related [+] filed by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Garnishment Summons
18 18 notice CerDocTyp - Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Thu 01/31 12:27 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript has been filed. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)17 Transcript filed
Friday, January 25, 2019
17 17 court Transcript filed Fri 01/25 1:21 PM
Transcript filed Re: Hearing Held 1/24/2019, Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 04/25/2019. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber eScribers, Telephone number 973-406-2250.] [Transcript Purchased by Cullen Speckhart.] Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 02/1/2019. Redaction Request Due By 02/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 02/25/2019. Transcript access will be restricted through 04/25/2019. (Gottlieb, Jason)
Related: [-] 16 Hearing continued; (Re: related document(s)12 Garnishment Summons) Hearing scheduled for 2/28/2019 at 10:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. Appearance: Franklin Cragle.
Thursday, January 24, 2019
16 16 court Hearing continued Thu 01/24 11:40 AM
Hearing continued; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 2/28/2019 at 10:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. Appearance: Franklin Cragle. (Oliver, Betty)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Garnishment Summons
Thursday, November 15, 2018
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Thu 11/15 2:53 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by U.S. Marshal's Office. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Garnishment Summons,13 Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Thu 11/15 2:50 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by U.S. Marshal's Office. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Garnishment Summons,13 Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, November 08, 2018
13 13 misc Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal Thu 11/08 11:01 AM
Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
12 12 summon Garnishment Summons (HDL) Thu 11/08 11:00 AM
Garnishment Summons; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 12/20/2018 at 10:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)11 Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
11 11 misc Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment Thu 11/08 10:58 AM
Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment -New Millennium Research LLC filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 06, 2018
10 10 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Mon 08/06 8:07 AM
Order Granting Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, May 03, 2018
9 9 misc Certification Thu 05/03 10:29 AM
Certification of No Objection Regarding Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)7 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,8 Notice of Motion filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
8 8 notice Notice of Motion (if setting a hearing, do not use) Wed 03/14 9:51 AM
Notice of Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)7 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
7 7 motion Entry of Default Wed 03/14 9:50 AM
Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2018
6 6 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 02/07 10:13 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Defendant Steven M. Stastny filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 8:25 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/21 5:36 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
Wednesday, May 03, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Wed 05/03 8:54 AM
Summons and notice issued to New Millennium Research LLC ; Steven M. Stastny Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, May 02, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 05/02 11:56 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-03303 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26157220, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 05/02 4:25 PM
Adversary case 17-03303 Complaint against New Millennium Research LLC, Steven M. Stastny filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2