New York Southern District Court
Judge:John F Keenan
Case #: 1:17-cv-03294
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:May 03, 2017
Terminated:Sep 28, 2017
Last checked: Monday Oct 30, 2017 5:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Yahoo! Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Thomas Foglia
Winston & Strawn Llp (ny)
contact info
Jennifer A. Golinveaux
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Thomas Patrick Lane
Winston & Strawn Llp (ny)
contact info
Plaintiff
Amnon Gutman
Represented By
Kamanta Clintessia Kettle
Liebowitz Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Richard Liebowitz
Liebowitz Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, September 28, 2017
31 31 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Terminated - Submitted Thu 09/28 1:18 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 9/28/2017 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (anc)
Related: [-]
30 30 1 pgs order Order of Discontinuance Thu 09/28 1:07 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is discontinued without costs to any party, subject to reopening if settlement is not consummated within 30 days of the date of this Order. If the parties wish to reopen this matter or extend the time within which they may reopen it, they must make a letter application to this Court before this 30-day period expires. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/28/2017) (anc)
Related: [-]
29 29 1 pgs order Order Thu 09/28 12:58 PM
ORDER: The conference in this case, previously set for Wednesday, October 4, 2017, has been cancelled. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/28/2017) (anc)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Letter Thu 09/28 2:03 AM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Richard Liebowitz dated September 28, 2017 re: Dismissal Letter. Document filed by Amnon Gutman.(Liebowitz, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2017
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Thu 09/14 1:54 PM
ORDER granting26 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. All parties consenting, the initial conference scheduled for September 20,2017 is adjourned to October 4, 2017 at 11:00 in Courtoom 20C. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 10/4/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John F. Keenan.) (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2017) (anc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
26 26 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 09/13 5:18 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference re: initial pretrial conference, addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Jennifer A. Golinveaux dated September 13, 2017. Document filed by Yahoo! Inc..(Golinveaux, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2017
25 25 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 08/30 11:56 AM
STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Parties in the above captioned action, acting by means of their respective counsel, that the time for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond with respect to the Complaint in the above matter is hereby extended from September 13, 2017 through and including October 13, 2017; and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Yahoo! Inc. answer due 10/13/2017.) (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/30/2017) (anc)
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 08/30 11:47 AM
ORDER granting23 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. All parties consenting, Defendant's request to adjourn the initial conference is GRANTED and the initial conference is now scheduled for September 20, 2017 at 11:00 A.M. in Courtroom 20C. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 9/20/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge John F. Keenan.) (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/30/2017) (anc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2017
23 23 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 08/29 5:14 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (initial pretrial conference), addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Jennifer A. Golinveaux dated August 29, 2017. Document filed by Yahoo! Inc..(Golinveaux, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 26, 2017
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Sat 08/26 1:45 AM
NOTICE of Attorney's Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by Amnon Gutman. (Kettle, Kamanta)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2017
21 21 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 08/08 1:33 PM
STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Parties in the above captioned action, acting by means of their respective counsel, that the time for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond with respect to the Complaint in the above matter is hereby extended from August 14, 2017 through and including September 13, 2017; and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED this 8 day of August, 2017. (Yahoo! Inc. answer due 9/13/2017.) (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/8/2017) (anc)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2017
20 20 order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Mon 08/07 11:12 AM
ORDER granting19 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference in this case has been adjourned from August 9, 2017 to Tuesday, September 6, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 9/6/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge John F. Keenan.) (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/7/2017) (anc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Deleted Document Mon 08/07 11:09 AM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 20 Order. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (anc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2017
19 19 motion Adjourn Conference Fri 08/04 6:09 PM
SECOND LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (initial pretrial conference), on consent, addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Jennifer A. Golinveaux dated August 4, 2017. Document filed by Yahoo! Inc..(Golinveaux, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2017
18 18 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/28 12:47 PM
Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice granting17 Motion for Andrew T. Foglia to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/28/2017) (anc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2017
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/29 11:21 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Liebowitz on behalf of Amnon Gutman. (Liebowitz, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2017
12 12 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 06/12 10:54 AM
STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Parties in the above captioned action, acting by means of their respective counsel, that the time for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond with respect to the Complaint in the above matter is hereby extended from June 13, 2017 through and including July 13, 2017; and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Yahoo! Inc. answer due 7/13/2017.) (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/9/2017) (anc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2017
10 10 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/06 1:36 PM
ORDER for Admission Pro Hac Vice granting9 Motion for Jennifer A. Golinveaux to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/5/2017) (anc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2017
8 8 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 05/16 2:45 PM
ORDER, The initial conference in this case is adjourned from July 13, 2017 to Wednesday, July 26, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. So Ordered. (Initial Conference set for 7/26/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge John F. Keenan.) (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/12/17) (yv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2017
7 7 order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 05/04 12:54 PM
NOTICE OF A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/13/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John F. Keenan. And as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/4/2017) (anc)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted Thu 05/04 11:53 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (kl)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 05/04 11:46 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yahoo! Inc. (kl)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 05/04 11:38 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John F. Keenan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (kl)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 05/04 11:41 AM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (kl)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 05/04 11:41 AM
Case Designated ECF. (kl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2017
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 05/03 6:46 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kettle, Kamanta)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney Wed 05/03 6:36 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Kettle, Kamanta)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 05/03 6:33 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yahoo! Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Amnon Gutman. (Kettle, Kamanta)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/03 6:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Yahoo! Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13620599)Document filed by Amnon Gutman.(Kettle, Kamanta)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C