Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-03328
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 03, 2017
Terminated:Nov 01, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Patricia M. Disharoon
Represented By
Patricia M. Disharoon
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Jennifer Tennile Langley
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Thursday, November 01, 2018
8 8 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Thu 11/01 8:07 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 31, 2018
7 7 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 10/31 1:27 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2017
6 6 answer None Tue 10/17 4:54 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by John D. McIntyre on behalf of Patricia M. Disharoon. (McIntyre, John)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 8:31 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/21 6:30 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
Thursday, May 04, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Thu 05/04 9:56 AM
Summons and notice issued to Patricia M. Disharoon Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, May 03, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 05/03 2:56 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-03328 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26163988, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 05/03 1:23 PM
Adversary case 17-03328 Complaint against Patricia M. Disharoon filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2