Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-03355
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 03, 2017
Terminated:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Robeson Medical Clinic, P.C.
Represented By
Robeson Medical Clinic, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Jennifer Tennile Langley
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Thursday, March 27, 2025
23 23 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Thu 03/27 1:46 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
22 22 order Directing Tue 06/30 2:55 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney; Cullen Drescher Speckhart terminated; Robert S. Westermann for Richard Arrowsmith added (Motion filed in 15-32919 (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2019
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/04 4:51 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Joshua David Stiff of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Stiff, Joshua)
Related: [-] related document(s)19 Order on Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney
20 20 misc Statement Mon 11/04 12:13 PM
Statement of Suggestion of Bankruptcy as to Robeson Medical Clinic, P.C. filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2019
19 19 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Mon 10/28 7:45 AM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Related [+]Diana L.C. McGraw terminated; (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] 18
Thursday, October 10, 2019
18 18 motion Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Thu 10/10 4:51 PM
Notice and Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney -Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel Related [+] . (Stiff, Joshua)
Related: [-] -Docketed to Include Certificate of Service
Thursday, October 03, 2019
17 17 motion Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Thu 10/03 1:38 PM
Notice and Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney -Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel . (Stiff, Joshua)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Thu 10/03 12:11 PM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw. (Stiff, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/18 11:50 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2019
14 14 court Certificate of Judgment for Registration in Another District Mon 06/24 12:58 PM
Certificate of Judgment for Registration in Another District Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)13 Letter filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
13 13 misc Letter Mon 06/24 12:57 PM
Letter - Request for a Certificate of Judgment for Registration in Another District filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
12 12 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Tue 05/21 10:46 AM
Order Granting Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, May 08, 2019
11 11 misc Certification Wed 05/08 10:33 AM
Certification of No Objection Regarding Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)9 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,10 Notice of Motion filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
10 10 notice Notice of Motion (if setting a hearing, do not use) Tue 04/16 1:41 PM
Notice of Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)9 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
9 9 motion Entry of Default Tue 04/16 1:39 PM
Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 24, 2018
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/24 8:57 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Diana L.C. McGraw of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(McGraw, Diana)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,7 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
7 7 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Fri 08/24 8:42 AM
Alias Summons and notice issued to Robeson Medical Clinic, P.C. Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, August 23, 2018
6 6 misc Request for Alias Summons Thu 08/23 4:00 PM
Request for Alias Summons for Robeson Medical Clinic, P.C. filed by Diana L.C. McGraw of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (McGraw, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 8:31 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/21 8:38 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
Thursday, May 04, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Thu 05/04 11:49 AM
Summons and notice issued to Robeson Medical Clinic, P.C. Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 05/04 9:35 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-03355 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26168822, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Wednesday, May 03, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 05/03 10:53 PM
Adversary case 17-03355 Complaint against Robeson Medical Clinic, P.C. filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2