New Jersey District Court
Judge:Freda L Wolfson
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:17-cv-03132
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 04, 2017
Terminated:Jul 11, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 31, 2017 5:42 AM EDT
Defendant
BLAIR ACADEMY
Represented By
CHRISTINE A. AMALFE
Gibbons, PC
contact info
RICHARD S. ZACKIN
Gibbons, PC
contact info
MATTHEW D. BATASTINI
Schwartz Hannum PC
contact info
Notice Only
arbtre
Plaintiff
MOTHER DOE
Represented By
ALAN E. SASH
Mclaughlin & Stern, Llp.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 04, 2018
24 24 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 05/04 10:55 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by BLAIR ACADEMY. (AMALFE, CHRISTINE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2017
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 09/20 4:04 PM
LETTER ORDER dismissing2 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym as Moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/20/2017. (km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2017
22 22 79 pgs misc Transcript Fri 07/28 3:39 PM
Transcript of MOTIONS held on 7/11/2017, before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Court Reporter- Vincent Russoniello (609-588-9516). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter, but not filed, by 8/15/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/25/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2017. (kas, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2017
21 21 order Order Referring Case to Arbitration Tue 07/11 2:16 PM
ORDER Referring Case to Arbitration; Plaintiff's7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED; Defendant's11 Motion to Compel Arbitration is GRANTED; this matter is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED pending the arbitration proceedings. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/11/2017. (km)
Related: [-]
20 20 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 07/11 11:32 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Motion Hearing held on 7/11/2017 re11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, and Subject Thereto, to Partially Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by BLAIR ACADEMY, Court Ordered Motion is Granted7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MOTHER DOE. Court Ordered Motion is Denied. Order to be filed. (Court Reporter/Recorder Vincent Russoniello.) (jmm, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 07/11 2:17 PM
***Civil Case Administratively Terminated. (km)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2017
19 19 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/10 12:55 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Kate Fletcher. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/10/2017. (km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2017
18 18 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/30 9:14 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Steven J. Hyman, Sharon Sprayregen, and Norman H. Siegel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/29/2017. (km)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Thu 06/29 9:50 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MOTHER DOE re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (SASH, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Sash Declaration,
Att: 2 Affidavit Mother Doe Affidavit,
Att: 3 Affidavit John Doe Affidavit,
Att: 4 Declaration Sally Roe Declaration,
Att: 5 Certification Certificate of Service
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/29 7:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MOTHER DOE.(SASH, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Alan Sash in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission of Kate Fletcher,
Att: 2 Certification Certification in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission (Kate Fletcher),
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission
15 15 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Thu 06/29 6:03 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BLAIR ACADEMY re11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, and Subject Thereto, to Partially Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) (AMALFE, CHRISTINE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/29 5:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD S. ZACKIN on behalf of BLAIR ACADEMY (ZACKIN, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 06/29 8:24 PM
Set Deadlines as to16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 8/7/2017 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2017
13 13 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Thu 06/22 7:58 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by BLAIR ACADEMY re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (AMALFE, CHRISTINE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Christopher Fortunato,
Att: 2 Declaration of Ryan Pagotto,
Att: 3 Declaration of Andee Ryerson,
Att: 4 Declaration of Carm Mazza,
Att: 5 Declaration of Richard Wenner, Esq.,
Att: 6 Declaration of Christine A. Amalfe, Esq.,
Att: 7 Certificate of Service
12 12 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Thu 06/22 3:11 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by MOTHER DOE re11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, and Subject Thereto, to Partially Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) (SASH, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, June 08, 2017
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 06/08 9:18 AM
Set Deadlines as to11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, and Subject Thereto, to Partially Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) . Motion set for 7/3/2017 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 06/08 11:24 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Telephone Conference held on 6/8/2017. Court set briefing schedule as follows: Opposition to Preliminary Injunction Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration due by 6/22/17; any Reply due by 6/29/17; Motion hearing scheduled for 7/11/17 at 10:00 A.M. (jg, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 06/08 11:28 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ,11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, and Subject Thereto, to Partially Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) . Motion set for Oral Argument for 7/11/2017 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. (jg, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
11 11 motion Compel Wed 06/07 5:18 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration, and Subject Thereto, to Partially Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) by BLAIR ACADEMY.(AMALFE, CHRISTINE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief of Defendant in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, and Subject Thereto, to Partially Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6),
Att: 2 Declaration of James Frick (with exhibits),
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
10 10 misc Letter Wed 06/07 2:49 PM
Letter from Christine A. Amalfe, Esq. re8 Letter. (AMALFE, CHRISTINE)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Substitution of Attorney Wed 06/07 10:30 AM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney MATTHEW D. BATASTINI terminated. Attorney CHRISTINE A. AMALFE for BLAIR ACADEMY added.. (AMALFE, CHRISTINE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2017
8 8 misc Letter Tue 06/06 4:21 PM
Letter from Alan E. Sash, regarding Request for Telephone Conference re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (SASH, ALAN)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Preliminary Injunction Tue 06/06 12:22 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MOTHER DOE.(SASH, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Alan E. Sash in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Plaintiff Mother Doe in Support of Her Motion for a Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 3 Affidavit of John Doe in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 4 Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Motion for a Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/06 2:48 PM
Set Deadlines as to7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion set for 7/3/2017 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2017
6 6 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 05/15 10:25 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer.(BATASTINI, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Mon 05/15 12:39 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BLAIR ACADEMY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/9/2017. (mmh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2017
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/08 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW D. BATASTINI on behalf of BLAIR ACADEMY (BATASTINI, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2017
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 05/05 10:10 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BLAIR ACADEMY Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Moller* (jem)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/05 10:11 AM
Set Deadlines as to2 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym . Motion set for 6/5/2017 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/05 10:12 AM
Set Deadlines as to3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Steven J. Hyman, Sharon Sprayregen, and Norman H. Siegel) . Motion set for 6/5/2017 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2017
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/04 4:23 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Steven J. Hyman, Sharon Sprayregen, and Norman H. Siegel) by MOTHER DOE.(SASH, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Alan Sash in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Steven J. Hyman, Sharon Sprayregen, and Norman H. Siegel,
Att: 2 Certification in Support of Pro Hac Vice Petition (Steven J. Hyman),
Att: 3 Certification in Support of Pro Hac Vice Petition (Sharon Sprayregen),
Att: 4 Certification in Support of Pro Hac Vice Petition (Norman H. Siegel),
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/04 4:13 PM
MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym by MOTHER DOE.(SASH, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym,
Att: 2 Declaration of Alan E. Sash, Esq. in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/04 3:52 PM
COMPLAINT against BLAIR ACADEMY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7817575) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MOTHER DOE.(SASH, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 05/04 4:59 PM
Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jjc)
Related: [-]