Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-03395
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 05, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Premier Clinics, P.A.
Represented By
Premier Clinics, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Bamidele A. Ekunsanmi
Represented By
Bamidele A. Ekunsanmi
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
40 40 court Hearing held Tue 01/18 11:59 AM
Hearing held; Garnishment Dismissed. Appearance(s): Brittany Falabella Related [+] (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)27 Garnishment Summons
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
39 39 court Hearing continued Tue 12/14 12:28 PM
Hearing continued per agenda filed in bankruptcy case 15-32919 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 1/18/2022 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)27 Garnishment Summons
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
38 38 court Hearing continued Tue 11/16 1:40 PM
Hearing continued per agenda filed in bankruptcy case 15-32919 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)27 Garnishment Summons
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
37 37 court Hearing continued Tue 10/12 5:46 PM
Hearing continued per agenda filed in bankruptcy case 15-32919 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 at 01:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)27 Garnishment Summons
36 36 court Hearing held Tue 10/12 1:53 PM
Hearing held; Garnishment Dismissed. Appearance(s): Brittany Falabella Related [+] (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)30 Garnishment Summons
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
34 34 misc Certificate of Service Tue 09/28 10:43 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by US Marshals Service. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)27 Garnishment Summons,28 Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
33 33 misc Certificate of Service Tue 09/28 10:38 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by US Marshals Service. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)30 Garnishment Summons,31 Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Friday, September 17, 2021
35 35 answer Answer Tue 09/28 11:05 AM
Answer - Garnishee's Answer Related [+] filed by US Marshals Service. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)30 Garnishment Summons
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
32 32 court Hearing continued Tue 09/14 12:36 PM
Hearing continued per agenda filed in bankruptcy case 15-32919 Appearance(s): Brittany Falabella for Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)27 Garnishment Summons,30 Garnishment Summons
Friday, August 27, 2021
31 31 misc Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal Fri 08/27 1:36 PM
Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
30 30 summon Garnishment Summons (HDL) Fri 08/27 1:35 PM
Garnishment Summons; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 9/14/2021 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)29 Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
29 29 misc Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment Fri 08/27 1:34 PM
Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment -Premier Clinics, P.A. filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal Fri 08/27 1:25 PM
Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
27 27 summon Garnishment Summons (HDL) Fri 08/27 1:25 PM
Garnishment Summons; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 9/14/2021 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)26 Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
26 26 misc Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment Fri 08/27 1:24 PM
Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment -Bamidele Ekunsanmi filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
25 25 order Judgment Wed 05/12 4:20 PM
Judgment for Plaintiff in the amount of $ $32,380.71 Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, November 05, 2020
24 24 court Hearing held Thu 11/05 12:50 PM
Hearing held; Motion GRANTED. Appearance(s): Franklin Cragle for Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee, Plaintiff Related [+] (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)21 Sealed Document filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
23 23 3 pgs order Order on Motion to File Document(s) Under Seal Wed 11/04 4:35 PM
Order Granting Motion to File Document(s) Under Seal Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] 19
Thursday, October 15, 2020
22 22 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 10/15 4:22 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2020 at 10:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-] related document(s)21 Sealed Document filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
21 21 motion Sealed Document Thu 10/15 4:21 PM
Sealed Motion/Applicatio Related [+] filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-] related document(s)19 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
20 20 notice Notice of Motion (if setting a hearing, do not use) Thu 10/15 4:20 PM
Notice of Motion to Seal Related [+] filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-] related document(s)19 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
19 19 motion Motion to File Document(s) Under Seal Thu 10/15 4:19 PM
Motion to File Document(s) Under Seal filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
18 18 order Directing Tue 06/30 3:37 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney; Cullen Drescher Speckhart terminated; Robert S. Westermann for Richard Arrowsmith added (Motion filed in 15-32919 (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2019
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/04 4:37 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Joshua David Stiff of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Stiff, Joshua)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Order on Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney
Monday, October 28, 2019
16 16 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Mon 10/28 7:50 AM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Related [+]Diana L.C. McGraw terminated; (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] 15
Thursday, October 10, 2019
15 15 motion Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Thu 10/10 4:51 PM
Notice and Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney -Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel Related [+] . (Stiff, Joshua)
Related: [-] -Docketed to Include Certificate of Service
Thursday, October 03, 2019
14 14 motion Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Thu 10/03 1:38 PM
Notice and Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney -Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel . (Stiff, Joshua)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Thu 10/03 12:11 PM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw. (Stiff, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2019
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/20 10:09 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 06, 2018
11 11 notice Notice of Motion (if setting a hearing, do not use) Tue 11/06 9:20 AM
Notice of Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
10 10 motion Entry of Default Tue 11/06 9:19 AM
Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 16, 2018
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Thu 08/16 11:11 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Diana L.C. McGraw of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(McGraw, Diana)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,8 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
8 8 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Thu 08/16 6:33 AM
Alias Summons and notice issued to Bamidele A. Ekunsanmi ; Premier Clinics, P.A. Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, August 14, 2018
7 7 misc Request for Alias Summons Tue 08/14 3:40 PM
Request for Alias Summons for Premier Clinics, P.A. and Bamidele A. Ekunsanmi filed by Diana L.C. McGraw of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (McGraw, Diana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 13, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Tue 03/13 10:42 AM
Amended Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Diana L.C. McGraw of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(McGraw, Diana)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY,4 Certificate of Service filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Att: 1 Order Approving Amended Procedures Governing Avoidance Action Adversary Proceedings
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 8:31 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/21 5:08 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
Tuesday, May 09, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Tue 05/09 9:42 AM
Summons and notice issued to Bamidele A. Ekunsanmi ; Premier Clinics, P.A. Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Friday, May 05, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 05/05 10:40 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-03395 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26182475, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 05/05 9:07 PM
Adversary case 17-03395 Complaint against Premier Clinics, P.A., Bamidele A. Ekunsanmi filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2