NULOOK CAPITAL, LLC v. Cardello III et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-72013
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-72013
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Louis A Scarcella |
Case #: | 8:17-ap-08134 |
Nature of Suit | 81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest 2 Bankruptcy - Other 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | May 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 17, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Michael Cardello III
Moritt, Hock & Hamroff, LLPO 400 Garden City Plaza
Garden City, NY 11530 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
International Professional Services, Inc.
330 Motor Parkway
Hauppauge, NY 11788 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joel Nazareno
330 Motor Parkway
Hauppauge, NY 11788 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
GWG MCA CAPITAL, LLC
220 South Sixth Street Suite 1200
Minneapolis, MN 55402 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NULOOK CAPITAL, LLC
5020 Sunrise Highway Suite 226
Massapequa Park, NY 11762 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 08/17 10:18 AM
Adversary Case 8:17-ap-8134 Closed (cam) |
||
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding
Wed 08/16 4:54 PM
Notice of Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by NuLook Capital, LLC. (Silverman, Kenneth) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 07/26 4:46 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Stephen E Turman on behalf of Michael Cardello III (Turman, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP)
Tue 07/18 8:04 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing. Pre-Trial Conference set for 07/27/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (cmoffett) |
||
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings)
Mon 07/17 3:44 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from July 20, 2017, 11 am to July 27, 2017, 11 am Filed by Ira R Abel on behalf of NuLook Capital, LLC (Abel, Ira) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Extending Time to File Answer
Thu 06/01 3:43 PM
Order Extending Time for Defendant "John Does" Nos. 1-10 to File Answer. Answer Due 7/7/2017; Michael Cardello III to File Answer. Answer Due 7/7/2017; Corporations, Limited Liability Companies and Other Entities Nos. 1-10 whose names are presently Unknown to File Answer. Answer Due 7/7/2017; GWG MCA Capital, LLC to File Answer. Answer Due 7/7/2017; Joel Nazareno to File Answer. Answer Due 7/7/2017. The Pretrial Conference is adjourned to July 20, 2017 at 11:00 am Signed on 6/1/2017 (cam) |
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP)
Thu 06/01 3:44 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Pre-Trial Conference set for 07/20/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (cmoffett) |
||
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 05/26 2:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Edward S. Stone on behalf of GWG MCA Capital, LLC (Stone, Edward) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 05/16 12:13 PM
Order Setting Pretrial Conference. . Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/11/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. Signed on 5/16/2017 (cam) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Summons In An Adversary Proceeding (Judge Trust and Judge Scarcella) (Auto)
Wed 05/10 4:07 PM
Summons In An Adversary Proceeding Issued by Clerk's Office against "John Does" Nos. 1-10 Answer Due: 6/9/2017; Michael Cardello III Answer Due: 6/9/2017; Corporations, Limited Liability Companies and Other Entities Nos. 1-10 whose names are presently Unknown Answer Due: 6/9/2017; GWG MCA CAPITAL, LLC Answer Due: 6/9/2017; Joel Nazareno Answer Due: 6/9/2017 (dnb) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 05/08 3:21 PM
Adversary case 8 17-08134 Complaint by NULOOK CAPITAL, LLC against Michael Cardello III, International Professional Services, Inc., Joel Nazareno, GWG MCA CAPITAL, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (81 (Subordination of claim or interest)). (Jacobs, PLLC, Randall) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent to Factoring Loans | ||
Att: 2 Adversary Cover Sheet |