UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CROW
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Maureen P Kelly |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00595 |
Nature of Suit | 690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other |
Cause | 28:1355 Petition for Return of Property |
Case Filed: | May 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 04, 2017 6:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
BRIAN CROW
|
|
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order
Mon 07/09 3:56 PM
ORDER directing that upon consideration of the Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, ECF No. 36, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 7/9/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Kelly, Maureen) |
|
36 | 36
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 07/09 3:26 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Skirtich, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 06/12 1:44 PM
ORDER OF COURT. The above-captioned matter having been resolved, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mark this case ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Nothing contained in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this matter and Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly will retain jurisdiction should further proceedings regarding settlement become necessary. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 06/12/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 06/06 1:02 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/6/2018. (Court Reporter: None) (eca) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
order
1 - Terminate Hearings Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 05/30 2:02 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. The Post-Discovery Status Conference previously scheduled for 6/6/2018 at 11:30 AM will now be held as a Telephone Status Conference. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to manage the call and to contact chambers once all parties are on the line. 412-208-7450. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 05/30/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) |
|
32 | 32
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 05/30 1:58 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/30/2018. (Court Reporter: None) (eca) |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 05/17 2:39 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Status Conference is scheduled for 5/30/2018 at 1:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to manage the call and to contact chambers at 412-208-7450 once all parties are on the line. Counsel are directed to contact the Court if this conference becomes unnecessary. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 05/17/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) |
|
30 | 30
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 05/17 2:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/17/2018. (Court Reporter: None) (eca) |
|
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 05/10 3:15 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Status Conference is scheduled for 5/17/2018 at 02:15 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to manage the call and to contact chambers at 412-208-7450 once all parties are on the line. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 05/10/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 02/13 3:22 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly: Status Conference held on 2/13/2018. (Court Reporter: None) (eca) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 02/06 8:33 AM
ORDER IMPLEMENTING FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 502(d). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 02/05/18. (eca) |
|
26 | 26
order
Case Management Order
Tue 02/06 8:29 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Disclosures required by Rule 26(a) due by 2/20/2018; Amended Pleadings due by 3/10/2018; Discovery due by 6/5/2018. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/6/2018 at 11:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 02/05/18. (eca) |
|
25 | 25
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 02/06 8:24 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Counsel are directed to file their Amended ADR Stipulation no later than 02/13/18. A Status Conference will be held 2/13/2018 at 3:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Attorney Skirtich shall attend the conference in person. Attorney Glaser will be connected to the conference via telephone. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 02/05/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) |
|
24 | 24
minutes
Case Management Conference
Tue 02/06 8:22 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/5/2018. (Court Reporter: None) (eca) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Thu 02/01 3:04 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Glaser, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) | ||
22 | 22
misc
Consent (Joint) to Proceed before US Mag. Judge
Thu 02/01 3:01 PM
Joint Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge by BRIAN CROW. (Glaser, Michael) |
|
21 | 21
adr
Stipulation Selecting ADR process
Thu 02/01 3:00 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by BRIAN CROW. (Glaser, Michael) |
|
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 02/01 10:00 AM
ORDER GRANTING19 Motion to Allow Defendant's Counsel to Appear by Telephone. Attorney Skirtich to attend in person. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 02/01/18. (eca) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)
Wed 01/31 7:26 PM
MOTION to Allow Defendant's Counsel to Appear by Telephone at the Case Management Conference on February 5 2018 re17 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, by BRIAN CROW. (Glaser, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 01/31 8:02 AM
ORDER OF COURT. Since this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file no later than 02/21/18, a form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge. The applicable form is available on the Court's website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. If the parties elect to have the case assigned to a Magistrate Judge, Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 01/31/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 01/18 10:20 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties shall confer no later than 01/26/18 to arrange for the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). A Rule 26(f) Report and either the Stipulation Selecting ADR Process or the Expedited Docket Stipulation due on or before 02/01/18. The Initial Case Management Conference is scheduled for 02/05/18 at 2:00 PM in the Chambers of Chief United States Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 01/18/18. (eca) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 12/29 6:00 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by BRIAN CROW. (Glaser, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/14 5:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Glaser on behalf of BRIAN CROW. (Glaser, Michael) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 11/14 4:44 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Answer due from BRIAN CROW. (Skirtich, Paul) |
|
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 11/14 1:01 PM
ORDER GRANTING12 Motion for Michael L. Glaser to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/14/17. (eca) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
Mon 11/13 8:37 PM
MOTION for attorney Michael L Glaser to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4528500) by BRIAN CROW. (Glaser, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Michael L Glaser, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Fri 10/27 3:24 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. BRIAN CROW served on 10/24/2017, answer due 11/14/2017. (plh) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents
Tue 10/24 9:48 AM
NOTICE to Court by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Skirtich, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 10/20 9:26 AM
ORDER GRANTING7 Motion for Special Order to Allow Alternative Service of Complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/20/17. (eca) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Thu 10/19 4:27 PM
BRIEF in Support re7 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Motion for Special Order to Allow Alternative Service of Complaint and Summons filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Skirtich, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)
Thu 10/19 4:20 PM
MOTION Motion for Special Order to Allow Alternative Service of Complain and Summons re Summons Issued,1 Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Skirtich, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wed 10/04 9:40 AM
ORDER GRANTING5 Motion to Extend Time to serve Defendant Brian Crow to October 25, 2017. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/04/17. (eca) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extend Time
Tue 10/03 3:27 PM
Second MOTION to Extend Time to October 25, 2017 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Skirtich, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Unexecuted
Tue 09/19 2:15 PM
Summons/Return of Service Returned Unexecuted by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to BRIAN CROW. (plh) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 09/01 10:20 AM
ORDER GRANTING2 Motion for Extension of Time Nunc Pro Tunc to Effectuate Service of Complaint and Summons. Plaintiff shall have until 10/05/17 to serve Defendant Brian Crow. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 09/01/17. (eca) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 08/31 2:51 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Nunc Pro Tunc to Effectuate Service of Complaint and Summons by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Skirtich, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only)
Tue 05/09 11:21 AM
COMPLAINT against BRIAN CROW, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (plh) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C |