California Eastern District Court
Judge:Kimberly J Mueller
Referred: Craig M Kellison
Case #: 2:17-cv-00973
Nature of Suit441 Civil Rights - Voting
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 08, 2017
Last checked: Thursday Jun 22, 2017 2:24 AM PDT
Defendant
Alex Padilla
Represented By
George Michael Waters
Department Of Justice, Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Baird
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Baird
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
California American Independent Party
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
California Libertarian Party
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kyle Carpenter
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Win Carpenter
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Citizens for Fair Representation
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info
Scott E. Stafne, PHV
Stafne Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Fort Jones
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
John D'Agostini
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
David Garcia
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Roy Hall, Jr.
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Leslie Lim
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Marin County Green Party
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Manuel Martinez
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin McGary
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Katherine Radinovich
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Terry Rapoza
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Shasta National Indian Tribe
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Patty Smith
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Howard Thomas
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Thomas
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Larry Wahl
Represented By
Gary Ln Zerman
Gary L. Zerman, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/22/2017 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, August 22, 2017
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 3:04 PM
REPLY by Mark Baird, Steven Baird, California American Independent Party, California Libertarian Party, Kyle Carpenter, Win Carpenter, Citizens for Fair Representation, City of Fort Jones, John D'Agostini, David Garcia, Roy Hall, Jr., Leslie Lim, Marin County Green Party, Manuel Martinez, Kevin McGary, Katherine Radinovich, Terry Rapoza, Shasta National Indian Tribe, Patty Smith, Howard Thomas, Michael Thomas, Larry Wahl to RESPONSE to11 Motion to Amend the Complaint. (Zerman, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2017
20 20 misc Reply Fri 9:08 AM
REPLY by Alex Padilla re15 Ex Parte Application for Reconsideration. (Waters, George)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 13, 2017
19 19 misc Response Sun 4:24 PM
RESPONSE by Mark Baird, Steven Baird, California American Independent Party, California Libertarian Party, Kyle Carpenter, Win Carpenter, Citizens for Fair Representation, City of Fort Jones, John D'Agostini, David Garcia, Roy Hall, Jr., Leslie Lim, Marin County Green Party, Manuel Martinez, Kevin McGary, Katherine Radinovich, Terry Rapoza, Shasta National Indian Tribe, Patty Smith, Howard Thomas, Michael Thomas, Larry Wahl to15 Ex Parte Application for Reconsideration. Attorney Stafne, Scott E. added. (Stafne, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2017
18 18 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 10:45 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 8/25/2017 is VACATED and RESET for 9/8/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due seven days prior. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing Thu 10:00 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. In light of defendant's ex parte request (ECF No.15 ) for reconsideration of this court's Minute Order (ECF No. 14), the court hereby SETS the motion for reconsideration for hearing on August 25, 2017 at 10:00 a.m., and ORDERS the following shortened briefing schedule on the request: Plaintiffs' opposition is due Monday, August 14, 2017 at 9:00 a.m.; defendants' reply, if any, is due Friday, August 18, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Hearing on the motion to dismiss and motion to amend (ECF Nos.9 ,11 ) currently calendared for August 25 is CONTINUED to September 8, 2017 at 10:00 a.m., with any replies to oppositions to those motions now due by September 1, 2017 at noon. All hearings will be held in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2017
16 16 respm Opposition to Motion Tue 5:29 PM
OPPOSITION by Citizens for Fair Representation to9 Motion to Dismiss. (Zerman, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2017
15 15 misc Ex Parte Application Thu 10:02 AM
EX PARTE APPLICATION by Alex Padilla for ExParte Order Reconsidering Minute Order. (Waters, George)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2017
14 14 order Minute Order Wed 2:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy A. Waldrop for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/2/2017 : In light of plaintiff's complaint and notice of requirement of three judge court, (ECF Nos.1 ,12 ), the court has determined this case implicates 28 U.S.C. 2284(a), providing for the convening of a three judge court. The court thereby DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to formally notify the Chief Judge of the Ninth Circuit of the pendency of this action, as 28 U.S.C. 2284(b)(1) requires, so that he may appoint a three judge court. SO ORDERED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY)(Waldrop, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2017
13 13 respm Opposition to Motion Tue 1:24 PM
OPPOSITION by Alex Padilla to11 Motion to Amend the Complaint. (Waters, George)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2017
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Fri 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Requirement of Three Judge Court by Mark Baird, Steven Baird, California American Independent Party, California Libertarian Party, Kyle Carpenter, Win Carpenter, Citizens for Fair Representation, City of Fort Jones, John D'Agostini, David Garcia, Roy Hall, Jr., Leslie Lim, Kevin McGary, Terry Rapoza, Howard Thomas, Michael Thomas, Larry Wahl re11 MOTION to AMEND the1 Complaint. (Zerman, Gary)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Amend the Complaint/Petition Fri 5:07 PM
MOTION to AMEND the1 Complaint by Mark Baird, Steven Baird, California American Independent Party, California Libertarian Party, Kyle Carpenter, Win Carpenter, Citizens for Fair Representation, City of Fort Jones, John D'Agostini, David Garcia, Roy Hall, Jr., Leslie Lim, Kevin McGary, Terry Rapoza, Howard Thomas, Michael Thomas, Larry Wahl. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2017 at 10:00 AM in cvbSACR Sacramento before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller.(Zerman, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, June 28, 2017
10 10 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 4:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 9/14/2017 is VACATED and ADVANCED to 8/25/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due seven days prior. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2017
9 9 motion Dismiss Tue 2:07 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by Alex Padilla. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Waters, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2017
8 8 misc Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge Tue 11:14 AM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Alex Padilla. Attorney Waters, George Michael added. (Waters, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2017
7 7 order Pro Hac Vice Order Tue 11:24 AM
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/16/2017. ADDING attorney Scott E. Stafne, PHV for Citizens for Fair Representation. (Washington, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2017
6 6 misc Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Thu 10:13 AM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Citizens for Fair Representation for attorney Scott E. Stafne to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7057716)(Zerman, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, May 09, 2017
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 1:54 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Alex Padilla served on 5/9/2017. (Michel, G.)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Tue 9:37 AM
SUMMONS RE-ISSUED as to *Alex Padilla* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gary L. Zerman* *23935 Philbrook Avenue* *Valencia, CA 91354*. (Michel, G.)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for KJM Tue 9:35 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 9/14/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Michel, G.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
2 2 service Summons Tue 9:17 AM
[DISREGARD - see4 Summons Re-issued] SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Alex Padilla* with answer to1 Complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gary L. Zerman* *23935 Philbrook Avenue* *Valencia, CA 91354*. (Michel, G.)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 4:40 PM
COMPLAINT against Alex Padilla by all plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0972-7052395) (Zerman, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C