Emilyn Domingo Viray v. CARGO FORCE, INC. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William Alsup |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-02694 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | May 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 06, 2017 12:33 AM PST |
Defendant
Cargo Force, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Morris Dau
|
|
Defendant
Christopher Stallworth
|
|
Plaintiff
Emilyn Domingo Viray
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 03/06 6:22 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL (pursuant to 26 stipulation AS MODIFIED) by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 03/06 4:41 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Emilyn Domingo Viray.(Herrington, Joan) (Filed on 3/6/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice | ||
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 11/21 10:39 PM
SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (pursuant to 24 stipulation) by Judge William Alsup. Close of Fact Discovery 3/2/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 5/25/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 10/1/2018 07:30 AM before Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 11/21 5:23 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER //Continuing All Deadline And Trial Date filed by Cargo Force, Inc..(Schumacher, Rachel) (Filed on 11/21/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 11/14 7:29 PM
CONSENT ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (pursuant to 22 ). Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/14/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2017) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Thu 11/09 5:01 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Rachel Caren Schumacher Consent Order for Substitution of Counsel (Schumacher, Rachel) (Filed on 11/9/2017) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 11/09 4:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Caren Schumacher (Schumacher, Rachel) (Filed on 11/9/2017) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Thu 09/07 12:45 PM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Amendment to19 Case Management Scheduling Order,. Correcting clerical error(s): Non-expert discovery cut-off date 12/29/2017. Date for designation of expert testimony and disclosure of full expert reports as to any issue on which a party has the burden of proof 12/29/2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017) |
|
Saturday, September 02, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Sat 09/02 12:27 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/30/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 6/4/2018 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2017. Discovery due by 8/31/2018. Motions due by 2/22/2018. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/25/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2017) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Case Referred to Private ADR ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Fri 08/25 4:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William Alsup: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/24/2017., Case referred to Private ADR. Amended Pleadings due by 9/29/2017. Close of Fact Discovery due by 12/29/2017. Dispositive Motion due by 2/22/2018. Jury Selection / Jury Trial set for 6/4/2018 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Pretrial Conference set for 5/30/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.Total Time in Court 13 minutes. Court Reporter Name Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney Joan Harrington. Defendant Attorney Jonathan Martin. Attachment Civil Minutes.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/24/2017) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/23 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joan Herrington for Plaintiff (Herrington, Joan) (Filed on 8/23/2017) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Joint Case Management Statement
Thu 08/17 4:50 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Cargo Force, Inc.. (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/17/2017) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 08/17 4:31 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS filed by Cargo Force, Inc.. (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/17/2017) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Mon 08/14 4:43 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options By Parties and Counsel (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/14/2017) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Thu 08/03 6:57 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Derby, Steven) (Filed on 8/3/2017) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/15 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Leo Derby (Derby, Steven) (Filed on 5/15/2017) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Change In Counsel
Thu 05/11 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Vincent Regis Fisher and Designation of Lead Attorney (Fisher, Vincent) (Filed on 5/11/2017) |
|
10 | 10
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Thu 05/11 1:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cargo Force, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER WITH ADR DEADLINES AND NOTICE OF ELIGIBILITY FOR VIDEO RECORDING (Fisher, Vincent) (Filed on 5/11/2017) |
|
9 | 9
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 05/11 12:50 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 8/17/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.(alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 05/10 12:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CARGO FORCE, INC. re1 Notice of Removal CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF STANDING ORDERS, et al. (Fisher, Vincent) (Filed on 5/10/2017) |
|
7 | 7
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 05/10 11:47 AM
Case assigned to Hon. William Alsup. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Wed 05/10 11:00 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by CARGO FORCE, INC. re1 Notice of Removal (Fisher, Vincent) (Filed on 5/10/2017) |
|
5 | 5
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Wed 05/10 10:58 AM
Declaration of JARED AZCUY in Support of1 Notice of Removal filed byCARGO FORCE, INC.. (Fisher, Vincent) (Filed on 5/10/2017) |
|
4 | 4
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Wed 05/10 10:57 AM
Declaration of VINCENT FISHER in Support of1 Notice of Removal RE: FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL IN STATE COURT AND SERVICE OF NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT filed byCARGO FORCE, INC.. (Fisher, Vincent) (Filed on 5/10/2017) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/10 10:55 AM
NOTICE by CARGO FORCE, INC. re1 Notice of Removal NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT (Fisher, Vincent) (Filed on 5/10/2017) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 05/10 10:53 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by CARGO FORCE, INC. . (Fisher, Vincent) (Filed on 5/10/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 05/10 10:51 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG16836806. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-11381127). Filed byCARGO FORCE, INC.. (Fisher, Vincent) (Filed on 5/10/2017) |