Doe v. Proskauer Rose, LLP
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Amy Berman Jackson |
Referred: | Barbara Jacobs Rothstein |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00901 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | May 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 10, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 08, 2017 4:20 AM EST |
Defendant
PROSKAUER ROSE, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Non-Party Respondent
JAMS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Non-Party Respondent
CAROL A. WITTENBERG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JANE DOE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
55 | 55
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 08/10 4:08 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by PROSKAUER ROSE, LLP. (McKenna, Kathleen) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 08/03 2:06 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting54 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties must file a joint status report by August 17, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/3/2018. (lcabj2) |