Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-03535
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 13, 2017
Terminated:Jan 08, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Michele Martin-Jones
Represented By
Michele Martin-Jones
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Jennifer Tennile Langley
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 08, 2019
8 8 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Tue 01/08 8:37 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 07, 2019
7 7 notice Notice of Dismissal Mon 01/07 11:46 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2017
6 6 answer None Tue 10/17 5:07 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by John D. McIntyre on behalf of Michele Martin-Jones. (McIntyre, John)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 8:36 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/23 5:09 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
Monday, May 15, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Mon 05/15 10:56 AM
Summons and notice issued to Michele Martin-Jones Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Saturday, May 13, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Sat 05/13 3:54 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-03535 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26232535, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Sat 05/13 11:44 AM
Adversary case 17-03535 Complaint against Michele Martin-Jones filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2