Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Nanette K Laughrey
Case #: 2:17-cv-04079
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:May 15, 2017
Terminated:Jun 25, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Nov 11, 2017 3:51 AM CST
Defendant
Logboat Brewing Company, LLC
Represented By
Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro
Franke, Schultz & Mullen - Kcmo
contact info
Matthew McKain Clifford
Franke, Schultz & Mullen - Kcmo
contact info
Defendant
Tyson Hunt
Plaintiff
Shipyard Brewing Company, LLC
Represented By
Darren K. Sharp
Armstrong Teasdale Llp-Kcmo
contact info
Edward J Sackman
contact info
Kevin Prewitt
Armstrong Teasdale Llp-Kcmo
contact info

GPO Dec 29 2017
ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Defendant Logboat Brewing Company, LLC's motion to dismiss Count V, Doc. 39, is granted in part, consistent with the Court's Order. Plaintiff Shipyard Brewing Company, LLC shall have seven days from the date of this Order in which to file an amended Count V, consistent with this Order.(Barragan-Scott, Alana)
GPO Jun 25 2018
ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Defendants' motion for summary judgment, Doc. 64, is GRANTED. The motion to strike, Doc. 61, accordingly is terminated.(Sreeprakash, Netra)
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, December 04, 2018
90 90 misc Costs Taxed Tue 12/04 3:04 PM
COSTS TAXED in amount of $2,221.20 against Plaintiff (Siegert, Karen)
Related: [-]