Carrie Couser v. Midland Credit Management, Inc., et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00940 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | May 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 11, 2017 1:31 AM PST |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Midland Credit Managment, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carrie Couser
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 07/26 2:49 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case10 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to the Stipulation of the Parties, this matter is dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice as to the named Plaintiff, Carrie Couser, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 07/24 11:07 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by plaintiff Carrie Couser.(Bacon, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order to dismiss | ||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 06/15 2:27 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT by Judge George H. Wu.On June 14, 2017, Plaintiff Carrie Couser filed a Notice of Settlement. The Court sets an Order to Show Cause re: Settlement Hearing for July 27, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are advised that the order to show cause will be vacated and no appearance will be required provided that a Stipulation to Dismiss, with a proposed order, is filed by noon on July 26, 2017. All previously set deadlines and dates are vacated and taken off-calendar. (cr) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Settlement
Wed 06/14 1:57 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Carrie Couser. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 05/18 10:01 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) MINUTE ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for June 29, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than June 15, 2017. See Local Rule 26-1. (cr) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order
Thu 05/18 9:52 AM
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (lom) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 05/15 12:55 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form
Mon 05/15 12:54 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge George H. Wu. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:17-cv-0940 GW (SPx). (esa) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 05/15 10:48 AM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Midland Credit Managment, Inc., identifying Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Encore Capital Group, Inc..(Landers, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 05/15 10:42 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Midland Credit Managment, Inc..(Landers, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 05/15 10:31 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County, case number RIC 1706422 Receipt No: 0973-19850187 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Midland Credit Managment, Inc.. (Attorney Thomas F Landers, Jr added to party Midland Credit Managment, Inc.(pty:dft))(Landers, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 1 State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex 2 State Court Answer, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 05/15 12:45 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Midland Credit Managment, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by Plaintiff Carrie Couser. (esa) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Mon 05/15 12:47 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Midland Credit Managment, Inc.(esa) |