EMAS IT Solutions Pte Ltd v. Dell Global B.V. (Singapore Branch)
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:17-bk-22405
Lead BK case is: 7:17-bk-22405
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert D Drain |
Case #: | 7:17-ap-08232 |
Nature of Suit | 72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | May 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Dell Global B.V. (Singapore Branch)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EMAS IT Solutions Pte Ltd
75 South Broadway Fourth Floor, Office Number 489
White Plains, NY 10601 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 06/16 1:30 PM
Adversary Case 7:17-ap-8232 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Correa, Mimi) |
||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Fri 05/19 3:50 PM
Notice of Dismissal Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7041 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) filed by Sharon L. Levine on behalf of EMAS IT Solutions Pte Ltd. (Levine, Sharon) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Thu 05/18 10:46 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Sharon L. Levine on behalf of EMAS IT Solutions Pte Ltd. with hearing to be held on 5/23/2017 (check with court for location) (Levine, Sharon) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 05/17 4:43 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Sharon L. Levine on behalf of EMAS IT Solutions Pte Ltd. (Levine, Sharon) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice, Hearing
Wed 05/17 4:32 PM
Notice of Hearing filed by Sharon L. Levine on behalf of EMAS IT Solutions Pte Ltd. with hearing to be held on 5/19/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse (Levine, Sharon) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Motion, Shorten Time
Wed 05/17 4:30 PM
Motion to Shorten Time with Respect to Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Sharon L. Levine on behalf of EMAS IT Solutions Pte Ltd. (Levine, Sharon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3
answer
Response
Wed 05/17 8:01 AM
Supplemental Response to Motion Supplemental Response in Support of Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Sharon L. Levine on behalf of EMAS IT Solutions Pte Ltd. (Levine, Sharon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certification of Counsel Regarding Service of Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction | ||
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Motion, Preliminary Injunction
Tue 05/16 10:57 AM
Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and , Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sharon L. Levine on behalf of EMAS IT Solutions Pte Ltd. (Levine, Sharon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Declaration | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Tue 05/16 10:46 AM
Adversary case 17-08232 Complaint against Dell Global B.V. (Singapore Branch) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (72 (Injunctive relief - other)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Dipesh Patel, Sharon L. Levine, Jeffrey C. Hampton, Aaron Applebaum, Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of EMAS IT Solutions Pte Ltd. (Levine, Sharon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D |