Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-06100

Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Paul Sala
Case #: 2:17-ap-00291
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 15, 2017
Terminated:Jul 17, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Manuel Ayala
Represented By
Manuel Ayala
contact info
Defendant
Manuel Gutierrez Avalos
Represented By
Manuel Gutierrez Avalos
contact info
Plaintiff
JILL H. FORD
2001 E. CAMPBELL AVE., SUITE 103
PHOENIX, AZ 85016
Represented By
Joel F Newell
Lane & Nach, P.C.
contact info
ADAM 1 NACH
Lane & Nach, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM MST
Monday, June 08, 2020
court Receipt for Adversary Filing Fee Mon 06/08 6:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 from JILL H. FORD. Receipt Number 20117749. (DI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 17, 2018
court Close Adversary Tue 07/17 11:16 AM
Adversary Terminated . (Purvis, Andamo)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 16, 2018
11 11 notice Dismissal of Complaint (Notice of) Mon 07/16 4:02 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Complaint filed by JOEL F. NEWELL of Lane & Nach, P.C. on behalf of JILL H. FORD. (NEWELL, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 22, 2018
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 06/24 9:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order Re: Potential Dismissal of Adversary
Thursday, June 21, 2018
9 9 order oPotential Dismissal of Adversary - VAN Form Thu 06/21 4:45 PM
ORDER Re: Potential Dismissal of Adversary . (Purvis, Andamo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2017
8 8 other Certificate of Service Wed 05/24 10:26 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Amended Complaint filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of JILL H. FORD. Related [+] (NACH, ADAM)
Related: [-] 5 Summons Issued,6 Amended Complaint
Sunday, May 21, 2017
7 7 notice Trustee Notice Regarding Filing Fee Sun 05/21 6:38 PM
Notice of Insufficient Estate Funds to Pay Filing Fee filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of JILL H. FORD. (NACH, ADAM)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Sun 05/21 6:37 PM
Amended Complaint against Manuel Gutierrez Avalos, Manuel Ayala, M & J Express, Inc. Manuel Ayala dba MG Express and Jane Doe Avalos filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of JILL H. FORD Related [+]. (NACH, ADAM)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Copies of Checks
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Summary of 548 Transfers
Friday, May 19, 2017
5 5 court Summons Issued (Form) Fri 05/19 11:27 AM
Summons Issued . (Estrella, Mary)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued (Form) Fri 05/19 9:23 AM
(ENTERED IN ERROR)Summons Issued . (Colasont, Kayla) Modified on 5/19/2017 (Estrella, Mary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2017
3 3 cmp Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 05/18 2:58 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons filed by JOEL F. NEWELL of Lane & Nach, P.C. on behalf of JILL H. FORD. (NEWELL, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2017
2 2 notice Trustee Notice Regarding Filing Fee Mon 05/15 3:45 PM
Notice of Insufficient Estate Funds to Pay Filing Fee filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of JILL H. FORD. (NACH, ADAM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Does not include a Section 727 Objection to Discharge) (No Fee Due or Fee Deferred) Mon 05/15 3:44 PM
Complaint (No Fee Due/Deferred) against Manuel Gutierrez Avalos, Manuel Ayala [Manuel Ayala dba M & J Express; Manuel Avalos dba MG EXPRESS] filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of JILL H. FORD. (NACH, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Copies of Checks
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Summary of 548 Transfers