California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Catherine E Bauer
Case #: 8:17-bk-11961
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2017
Dismissed:Mar 15, 2018
Terminated:Oct 23, 2018

Debtor
Eagan Avenatti LLP
520 Newport Center Dr Ste 1400
Newport Beach, CA 92660-7034
Represented By
Eagan Avenatti LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Petitioning Creditor
Gerald Tobin
2014 Edgewater Dr #169
Orlando, FL 32804
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701

Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Friday, July 12, 2024
593 593 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 07/12 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 590 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
592 592 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 07/12 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 77. Notice Date 07/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 591 Notice of reassignment of case (BNC)
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
591 591 misc Notice of reassignment of case (BNC) Wed 07/10 10:28 AM
Notice of reassignment of case (BNC) (HC)
Related: [-]
590 590 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 07/10 10:21 AM
Order Reassigning Bankruptcy Case To The Hon. Scott C. Clarkson (BNC-PDF) Related [+] - Bankruptcy Case is Reassigned to the Hon. Scott C. Clarkson based on related case 8:19-bk-13560 -SC. The bankruptcy case number will remain the same, but the Judge's initials will be changed to SC. Signed on 7/10/2024 (GD)
Related: [-] doc
court Case Reassigned (Manual) Wed 07/10 10:27 AM
Judge Scott C Clarkson added to case, per order #590. Involvement of Judge Catherine E. Bauer Terminated (HC)
Related: [-]