Virginia Western District Court
Judge:Norman K Moon
Referred: Robert S Ballou
Case #: 6:17-cv-00041
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:May 17, 2017
Terminated:Mar 20, 2018

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 12/19/2023 11:59 PM EST
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
34 34 notice Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Tue 03/20 2:34 PM
Notice of Cancellation of Jury Trial on 7/23/2018 thru 8/1/2018 (Cancel Court Reporter) (sfc)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41 Tue 03/20 2:33 PM
Clerks Entry of Dismissal with prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (sfc)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 03/20 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cameron M. Jackson (Farmer, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 02/28 3:50 PM
ORDER granting30 Motion to Dismiss Count I of Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on February 28, 2018. (sfc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2018
30 30 motion Dismiss Mon 02/26 5:32 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Count I of Plaintiff's Complaint by Cameron M. Jackson. (Farmer, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
29 29 18 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 01/30 1:40 PM
CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER granting28 Consent Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on January 30, 2018. (sfc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2018
28 28 motion Protective Order Fri 01/26 12:53 PM
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Liberty University, Len Stevens.Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou.(Riley, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 14, 2017
27 27 3 pgs discov Expert Discovery Report Tue 11/14 3:21 PM
Expert Discovery Report by Cameron M. Jackson.(Farmer, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Supplement Expert Qualifications,
Att: 2 5 pgs Supplement Prior Deposition Testimony Experience,
Att: 3 5 pgs Supplement Prior Trial Testimony Experience,
Att: 4 1 pgs Supplement Expert Compensation,
Att: 5 1 pgs Supplement Expert Compensation
Wednesday, October 18, 2017
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document Wed 10/18 4:03 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's deadline for expert disclosures is extended to 11/15/17; defendant's deadline for expert disclosures is extended to 12/15/17; and all other terms and conditions of this Court's Amended Pretrial Order of 6/12/17 shall remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on October 18, 2017. (sfc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2017
25 25 3 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 10/16 4:16 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Expert Disclosures by Cameron M. Jackson.Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (Farmer, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2017
24 24 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/17 3:04 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Sarah Browning.(Karn, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2017
23 23 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 08/15 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for 7/23/2018 thru 7/27/2018 and 07/30/2018 thru 8/1/2018 at 09:30 AM in Lynchburg before Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (sfc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2017
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 08/03 10:52 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part, as set forth herein,6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Elysa Bucci, Valerie Dufort, Jonathan Ignacio, Liberty University, Robert Mullin, Len Stevens, &9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Sarah Browning. As a result of this Order, Defendants Robert Mullin, Valerie Dufort, Jonathan Ignacio, and Elysa Bucci are dismissed from the case. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on August 3, 2017. (ca)
Related: [-]
21 21 29 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Thu 08/03 10:48 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on August 3, 2017. (ca)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2017
20 20 minutes Motion Hearing Fri 07/21 3:33 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Norman K. Moon: Motion Hearing held on 7/21/2017 re6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Liberty University, Len Stevens, Valerie Dufort, Robert Mullin, Elysa Bucci, Jonathan Ignacio,9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Sarah Browning. (Court Reporter Judy Webb.) (sfc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2017
18 18 1 pgs order Order Fri 07/14 2:46 PM
ORDER: In the interests of efficiency at oral argument, the Court hereby notifies the parties that it finds the following issues adequately briefed and in need of no further argument: Count XV (statutory conspiracy) and Count XVI (malicious abuse of legal process). The parties should be prepared to argue all other issues at the hearing on July 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on July 14, 2017. (sfc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2017
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 06/14 3:44 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Sarah Browning. (Karn, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2017
16 16 10 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 06/13 3:53 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Elysa Bucci, Valerie Dufort, Jonathan Ignacio, Liberty University, Robert Mullin, Len Stevens. (Riley, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2017
15 15 order Pretrial Order Mon 06/12 4:20 PM
AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on June 12, 2017. (ca)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Mon 06/12 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) . Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2017 02:00 PM in Lynchburg before Judge Norman K. Moon. (sfc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2017
13 13 3 pgs motion Amend/Correct Thu 06/08 3:32 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct5 Pretrial Order, Case Referred to Magistrate Judge by Elysa Bucci, Valerie Dufort, Jonathan Ignacio, Liberty University, Robert Mullin, Len Stevens.Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou.(Riley, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
12 12 15 pgs respm Brief / Memorandum in Opposition Wed 06/07 3:44 PM
Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Cameron M. Jackson. (Farmer, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2017
11 11 18 pgs respm Brief / Memorandum in Opposition Tue 06/06 1:35 PM
Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Cameron M. Jackson.(Farmer, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit E
Wednesday, May 24, 2017
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 05/24 4:52 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Memorandum In Support by Sarah Browning. (Karn, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 05/24 4:51 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Sarah Browning. (Karn, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
8 8 71 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/24 9:34 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Elysa Bucci, Valerie Dufort, Jonathan Ignacio, Liberty University, Robert Mullin, Len Stevens.(Riley, Melissa)
Related: [-]
7 7 15 pgs respm Brief / Memorandum in Support Wed 05/24 9:32 AM
Brief / Memorandum in Support re6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Elysa Bucci, Valerie Dufort, Jonathan Ignacio, Liberty University, Robert Mullin, Len Stevens. (Riley, Melissa)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 05/24 9:30 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Elysa Bucci, Valerie Dufort, Jonathan Ignacio, Liberty University, Robert Mullin, Len Stevens. (Riley, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2017
5 5 order Pretrial Order ~Util - Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Tue 05/23 3:36 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER (CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou). Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on May 23, 2017. (sfc)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc State Court Records Tue 05/23 11:30 AM
State Court Records from Lynchburg Circuit Court(sfc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Wednesday, May 17, 2017
3 3 1 pgs order Order Requesting State Court Record Wed 05/17 4:24 PM
Order Requesting Transmittal of Original Case File from Lynchburg Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on May 17, 2017. (ca)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 05/17 10:55 AM
Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty University (sfc)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs notice Notice of Removal Wed 05/17 10:54 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lynchburg Circuit Court, case number 680CL17000345-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.00, Receipt 600001998) filed by Liberty University, Robert Mullin, Valerie Dufort, Jonathan Ignacio, Elysa Bucci, and Len Stevens.(sfc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 84 pgs State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 The Liberty Way Handbook,
Att: 3 Sexual Assault Policies,
Att: 4 Liberty Sexual Harassment, Discrimination, and Assault Policy,
Att: 5 Statement of Findings on Sexual Assault Allegations,
Att: 6 State Court Summons and Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 State Court Notice of Removal to Federal Court,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 9 Cover Letter,
Att: 10 Receipt