Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC v. Black Elk Energy Offshore Operations, LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-31646
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-31646
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:17-ap-03249 |
Nature of Suit | 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | May 18, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Argonaut Insurance Company
100 Marine Parkway Suite 500
Redwood City, CA 94065 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-10
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Maritech Resources, Inc.
24955 Interstate 45 North
The Woodlands, TX 77380 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Merit Energy Company LLC
13727 Noel Road Tower 2 Suite 500
Dallas, TX 75240 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
JX Nippon Oil Exploration U.S.A. Limited
5847 San Felipe Suite 2800
Houston, TX 77057 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fieldwood Energy LLC
2000 W Sam Houston Pkwy S Suite 1200
Houston, TX 77042 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fairways Exploration, Inc.
13430 Northwest Freeway Suite 800
Houston, TX 77040 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Energy Resources Technology GOM LLC
8201 Preston Road
Dallas, TX 75225 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Westchester Fire Insurance Company
436 Walnut Street
Philadelphia, PA 19106 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Energy XXI GOM, LLC
1021 Main Street, Suite 2626
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
McMoran Oil & Gas LLC
1615 Poydras Street Suite 600
New Orleans, LA 70112 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
W&T Offshore, Inc.
Michael C. Sanders 9 Greenway Plaza Suite 210
Houston, TX 77046 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard Schmidt, Trustee of the Black Elk Trust
615 Leopard Street Suite 635
Corpus Christi, TX 78401 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Black Elk Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Black Elk Energy Offshore Operations, LLC
11451 Katy Freeway
Houston, TX 77079 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC
824 W. Sam Houston Parkway N Suite 500
Houston, TX 77024 |
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 03 2017
Memorandum Opinion of Bankruptcy Judge. Signed on 10/3/2017 (mrios) |
|
GPO
Oct 31 2018
Memorandum Opinion of Bankruptcy Judge, Signed on 10/31/2018. (rcas) |