WILLIAM JORDAN INVESTMENTS INC
Member Case
Lead case is: 8:17-bk-11996
Lead case is: 8:17-bk-11996
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Scott C Clarkson |
Case #: | 8:17-bk-12019 |
Case Filed: | May 18, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
WILLIAM JORDAN INVESTMENTS, INC.
23046 Avenida de la Carlota Ste 150
Laguna Hills, CA 92653-1569 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, August 15, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Request for special notice Filed by Interested Party Courtesy NEF. (Brown, Michael) |
|
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Notice of Change of Address with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor William Jordan Investments Inc. (Ekvall, Lei Lei) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Notice of Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Claim in a Chapter 11 with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor William Jordan Investments Inc. (Ekvall, Lei Lei) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Notice of Change of Address with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor William Jordan Investments Inc. (Ekvall, Lei Lei) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Notice of Change of Address with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor William Jordan Investments Inc. (Ekvall, Lei Lei) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , List of Equity Security Holders , Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) , Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) , Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Corporate parents added to case: William Jordan., Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor William Jordan Investments Inc . (Ekvall, Lei Lei) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
![]() BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/22/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Order Granting Application Of Debtor And Debtor-In-Possession For Approval Of Employment Of Smiley Wang-Ekvall, LLP, As Counsel [AFFECTS ALL DEBTORS] (Original Motion filed in Lead Case No. 8:17-bk-11996-SC - see docket no. 34 ) (BNC-PDF) Signed on 6/20/2017. (Bolte, Nickie) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Notice Notice of Joint Administration of Cases and Requirements for Filing Documents [LBR 1015-1] Filed by Debtor William Jordan Investments Inc. (Ekvall, Lei Lei) |
|
Sunday, June 04, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
![]() BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/04/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Order Authorizing Extension Of Time To File Schedules And Statement Of Financial Affairs Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 1007. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is granted and the deadline for the Debtors to file their schedules and statement of financial affairs is extended from June 1, 2017 and June 8, 2017, to June 30, 2017 for all of the Debtors. Original Motion filed in Lead Case No. 8:17-bk-11996-Sc see docket no. 38 . [ORDER AFFECTS ALL DEBTORS] (BNC-PDF) Signed on 6/2/2017. (Bolte, Nickie) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Joint Administration of Cases and Requirements for Filing Documents [LBR 1015-1] with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor William Jordan Investments Inc. (Ekvall, Lei Lei) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
![]() BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 05/26/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/10/2017 at 10:00 AM at RM 1-154, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. (Corona, Heidi) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Notice Notice of Joint Administration of Cases and Requirements for Filing Documents [LBR1015-1] with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor William Jordan Investments Inc . (Ekvall, Lei Lei) |
|
Sunday, May 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
![]() BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/21/2017. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
![]() BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/21/2017. (Admin.) |
|
7 | 7
![]() BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/21/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order Granting Motion To Approve Joint Administration Of Cases. Lead Case: WJA Asset Management, LLC (Case No. 8:17-bk-11996-SC) Jointly Administered With Member Cases: 5827 Winland Hills Drive Development Fund, LLC 8:17-bk- 11997-SC; Alabama Housing Fund, LLC 8:17-bk-11998-SC; CA Express Fund, LLC 8:17-bk-11999-SC; CA See Jane Go Fund, LLC 8:17-bk-12000-SC; CA Whirl Fund, LLC 8:17-bk-12001-SC; Clairton Residential Renewal, LLC 8:17-bk-12002-SC Equity Indexed Managed Fund, LLC 8:17-bk-12003-SC; Luxury Asset Purchasing International, LLC 8:17-bk-12004-SC; LVNV Multi Family LLC 8:17-bk-12005-SC PMB Managed Fund, LLC 8:17-bk-12006-SC; Prosper Managed Fund, LLC 8:17-bk- 12008-SC; TD Opportunity Fund, LLC 8:17-bk-12009-SC; TD REO Fund, LLC 8:17-bk- 12010-SC; Urban Produce Fund, LLC 8:17-bk-12011-SC; Whirl Fund, LLC 8:17-bk- 12012-SC; WJA Express Fund, LLC 8:17-bk-12013-SC; WJA Real Estate Opportunity Fund I, LLC 8:17-bk-12014-SC; WJA Real Estate Opportunity Fund II, LLC 8:17-bk- 12015-SC; WJA Secure Real Estate Fund, LLC 8:17-bk-12016-SC; WJA Secure Income Fund, LLC 8:17-bk-12018-SC; William Jordan Investments, Inc. 8:17-bk- 12019-SC (BNC-PDF) Signed on 5/19/2017. (Bolte, Nickie) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Langley, Christopher. (Langley, Christopher) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Motion for Joint Administration Debtor's Emergency Motion for Order Authorizing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; and Declarations of Howard B. Grobstein and William Jordan in Support with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor William Jordan Investments Inc (Marticello, Robert) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document
Thu 05/18 5:08 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Petition was filed as Incomplete, but schedules or statements are deficient and terminated. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE THE DEFICIENT DOCUMENTS IMMEDIATELY. (Beezer, Cynthia) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor WILLIAM JORDAN INVESTMENTS, INC.. (Ekvall, Lei Lei) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by WILLIAM JORDAN INVESTMENTS, INC. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 06/1/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 06/1/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 06/1/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 06/1/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 06/1/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 06/1/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 06/1/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 06/1/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 06/1/2017. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 06/1/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 06/1/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 06/1/2017. (Ekvall, Lei Lei) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 05/18 12:43 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(8:17-bk-12019) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44850261. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
U - Assigned Judge to a case (Manual)
Thu 05/18 1:55 PM
Judge Scott C Clarkson added to case. Affiliated to Lead Case: 8:17-bk-11996-SC WJA ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Corona, Heidi) |
||
misc
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn)
Thu 05/18 5:01 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 6/1/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 6/1/2017. (Beezer, Cynthia) |