Peter Luger, Inc. v. Carl Von Luger, LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Alison J Nathan |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03767 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | May 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 02, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 14, 2017 4:23 AM EST |
Plaintiff
Peter Luger, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Carl Von Luger, LLC
Terminated: 08/03/2017
|
|
Defendant
Robert Dickert
Terminated: 08/03/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Thu 08/03 11:19 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(i), Plaintiff Peter Luger, Inc. hereby gives notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed against Defendants Carl von Luger, LLC and Robeti Dickert. SO ORDERED. Carl Von Luger, LLC and Robert Dickert (an individual) terminated. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/3/2017) (mml) |
|
16 | 16
misc
AO 120 Form Trademark - Case Terminated - Submitted
Thu 08/03 8:07 AM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 8/2/2017 in a court action filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (km) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/02 5:34 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Carl Von Luger, LLC, Robert Dickert. Document filed by Peter Luger, Inc.. (Elkin, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 06/30 12:10 PM
ORDER: granting13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SO ORDERED. Carl Von Luger, LLC answer due 7/31/2017; Robert Dickert answer due 7/31/2017. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/29/2017) (ama) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 06/29 5:19 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint, until July 31, 2017, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael S. Elkin dated 6/29/2017. Document filed by Peter Luger, Inc..(Elkin, Michael) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Thu 05/25 2:13 PM
NOTICE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Wednesday, August 23, 2017 at 3:15 pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Initial Conference set for 8/23/2017 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/25/2017) (js) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 05/23 10:40 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Jennifer A. Golinveaux to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (Nathan, Alison) |
|
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Tue 05/23 9:21 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 10 MOTION for Jennifer A. Golinveaux to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13694624. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma) |
||
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 05/22 7:08 PM
MOTION for Jennifer A. Golinveaux to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13694624. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Peter Luger, Inc..(Golinveaux, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jennifer A. Golinveaux, with Certificate, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Fri 05/19 12:53 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Dickert. (kl) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Fri 05/19 12:50 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carl Von Luger, LLC. (kl) |
|
7 | 7
misc
AO 120 Form Trademark - Case Opening - Submitted
Fri 05/19 12:48 PM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (kl) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Fri 05/19 12:39 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael S. Elkin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Kings. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (kl) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Fri 05/19 12:41 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael S. Elkin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Robert Dickert. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (kl) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 05/19 12:42 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (kl) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 05/19 12:43 PM
Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (kl) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 05/19 12:44 PM
Case Designated ECF. (kl) |
||
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Thu 05/18 5:17 PM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Elkin, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 05/18 5:08 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert Dickert, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Peter Luger, Inc.. (Elkin, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 05/18 5:06 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Carl von Luger, LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Peter Luger, Inc.. (Elkin, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 05/18 5:03 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Peter Luger, Inc..(Elkin, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 05/18 5:02 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Elkin, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/18 5:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Carl Von Luger, LLC, Robert Dickert. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13682501)Document filed by Peter Luger, Inc..(Elkin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - certificates of registration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - My Palm Beach Post article |