Edwards v. Cofield et al
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William Keith Watkins |
Referred: | Stephen Michael Doyle |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00321 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | May 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 14, 2017 3:09 AM CST |
Defendant
David Cofield
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christopher May
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jill Puckett
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Clay Tinney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kandace Kay Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/14/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
203 | 203
respoth
Response in Opposition
Thu 03/28 4:02 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re202 MOTION Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defs' Motion to Dismiss re190 MOTION to Dismiss,191 MOTION to Dismiss (Judicial Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority) by Christopher May, Amy Newsome, Clay Tinney. (McKay, Charles) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
202 | 202
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 03/21 9:03 AM
Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defs' Motion to Dismiss re190 MOTION to Dismiss,191 MOTION to Dismiss by Kandace Kay Edwards. (West, Micah) Modified text on 3/21/2024 (LAB) |