Boron Capital, LLC et al v. Linn Energy, LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:16-bk-60040
Lead BK case is: 6:16-bk-60040
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher M Lopez |
Case #: | 6:17-ap-06004 |
Nature of Suit | 1 null |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 30, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Linn Energy, LLC
1999 Bryan St., Ste. 900
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Boron Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Midland Corporate Ranch LLP
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
trustee
Remark (batch)
Tue 10/17 5:17 PM
Remark: Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. . (DawnaKelly) |
|
Saturday, December 02, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 12/02 11:57 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Thu 11/30 3:46 PM
Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Case 6:17-ap-6004 Signed on 11/30/2017 (LinhthuDo) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 11/17 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/16/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Extend Time
Tue 11/14 9:56 AM
Order Granting Agreed Motion to Extend Linn Energy, LLCs Expert Designation Deadline Signed on 11/13/2017. (LinhthuDo) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extend Time
Fri 10/06 9:09 AM
Motion to Extend Time for Linn Energy LLC Expert Designation Filed by Linn Energy, LLC (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 08/31 11:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/31/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (Form)
Tue 08/29 2:00 PM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to15 Transcript. Parties notified (dhan) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
42
pgs
court
Transcript
Fri 08/25 8:36 AM
Transcript RE: Status Hearing held on August 22, 2017 before Judge David R. Jones. Transcript is available for viewing in the Clerk's Office. Filed by Transcript access will be restricted through 11/24/2017. (mhen) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 08/24 11:57 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/24/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
court
Courtroom Minutes (Text)
Tue 08/22 3:02 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 2:41 pm. Appearances: Patricia Tomasco and Matthew Cavenaugh for the Debtor Counsel for the Defendant informed the Court that a Rule 26 report had not been filed. (dsta) |
||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Comprehensive Scheduling Order
Tue 08/22 8:09 AM
Scheduling Order Signed on 8/21/2017 Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/14/2017 at 03:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). Pre-Trial Order due by 11/10/2017. Discovery due by 10/27/2017. (dsta) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Proposed Order
Wed 08/16 3:28 PM
Proposed Order RE: Scheduling Order (Filed By Linn Energy, LLC ). (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 07/27 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/26/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Adversary Order Setting Hearing
Mon 07/24 4:10 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2017 at 02:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo) |
|
Sunday, May 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 05/21 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/21/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Fri 05/19 6:30 AM
Notice and Order regarding exchanging of exhibits and witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings. |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7 Case electronically transferred in from Texas Western court. Case number: 7:17-ap-07006. (ltie) | |
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 05/05/2017. (Admin.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2017.] | |
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 Order Regarding (Order entered on 5/3/2017) (Boyd, Laurie) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2017.] | |
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
ICC-Fee Terminated for Complaint 17-07006 jqj) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00), Amount $ 350.00, Receipt 18136902 (U.S. Treasury) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2017.] | ||
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 Motion to Transfer Case Out of Western District (Transferring To: Southern ), (21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Patricia Baron Tomasco for Defendant Linn Energy, LLC. (Tomasco, Patricia) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet filed by Patricia Baron Tomasco for Defendant Linn Energy, LLC (Tomasco, Patricia) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2017.] | |
2 | 2 Incorrect Summons Not Being Issued on Linn Energy, LLC Answer Due 05/8/2017 (Tomasco, Patricia) Modified on 4/7/2017 (Benitez, Estella). [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2017.] | |
1 | 1 Adversary case 17-07006 Notice of Removal filed by Boron Capital, LLC (attorneys Philip Werner, Scott Raynes, against Linn Energy, LLC (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(01 (Determination of removed claim or cause))). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Tomasco, Patricia) Modified on 4/7/2017 to Correct Text (Benitez, Estella). [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2017.] (Entered: 04/06/2017) |