VX119 Media Capital, LLC v. Outlook Enterprises LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03786 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | May 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 15, 2017 1:30 AM PST |
Defendant
Outlook Enterprises LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trevor Pryce
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
VX119 Media Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/14/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Thu 05/25 2:19 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - West District. (jp) |
|
17 | 17
order
Remand Case to State Court
Thu 05/25 2:17 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT by Judge John F. Walter: Defendants have failed to allege the citizenship of any of the members of Plaintiff or Outlook. Accordingly, this action is REMANDED to Los Angeles Superior Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Made JS-6 Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
16 | 16
stip
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 05/25 2:06 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendants Outlook Enterprises LLC, Trevor Pryce.(James, Collie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 05/24 3:29 PM
ORDER DISMISSING DOES by Judge John F. Walter: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 100, inclusive. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Does 11 through 100 inclusive, terminated.) (cw) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 05/22 2:33 PM
COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for July 3, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before June 16, 2017. (jloz) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order
Mon 05/22 2:32 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (jloz) |
|
12 | 12
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 05/22 2:28 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by chambers of Judge John F. Walter. If not yet provided, courtesy copies of all case opening documents shall be delivered to chambers by 12:00 p.m. on May 23, 2017. Failure to comply may result in an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal and/or Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Rules. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jloz) |
|
11 | 11
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Mon 05/22 2:13 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gregory A. Dorsey. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) |
|
9 | 9
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 05/22 1:18 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 05/22 1:18 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Errata
Fri 05/19 1:05 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Outlook Enterprises LLC, Trevor Pryce. correcting Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 Re Declaration of Trevor Pryce Docket Entry No. 1-2(James, Collie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Trevor Pryce | ||
6 | 6
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 05/19 11:56 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Outlook Enterprises LLC, Trevor Pryce. (James, Collie) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Fri 05/19 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Collie F James, IV on behalf of Defendants Outlook Enterprises LLC, Trevor Pryce (James, Collie) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 05/19 11:48 AM
FRCP Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Outlook Enterprises LLC, (James, Collie) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 05/19 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Trevor Pryce, identifying Splash Entertainment, LLC. (James, Collie) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 05/19 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Outlook Enterprises LLC, identifying Splash Entertainment, LLC. (James, Collie) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 05/19 11:27 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number SC127183 Receipt No: 0973-19882959 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Trevor Pryce, Outlook Enterprises LLC. (Attorney Collie F James, IV added to party Outlook Enterprises LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Collie F James, IV added to party Trevor Pryce(pty:dft))(James, Collie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Complaint and Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Trevor Pryce | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 05/22 11:56 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendant Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Outlook Enterprises LLC, Trevor Pryce. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff VX119 Media Capital, LLC. Filed in State Court on 3/6/2017 Submitted with Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (car) |