Henry Mendoza v. Allied Interstate LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | James V Selna |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00885 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 47:0227 Violation of Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Case Filed: | May 19, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Nov 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 20, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 15, 2017 1:40 AM PST |
Defendant
Allied Interstate LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Synchrony Bank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Henry Mendoza
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
73 | 73
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Tue 02/25 4:27 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,68 filed by Henry Mendoza. CCA # 19-56357 Pursuant to the parties' stipulated motion, this appeal is voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (es) |