Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-03653
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 19, 2017
Terminated:Nov 21, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Rick Lee Jackson
Represented By
Rick Lee Jackson
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Jennifer Tennile Langley
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
7 7 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Tue 11/21 10:01 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2017
6 6 notice Notice of Dismissal Mon 11/20 9:47 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 8:51 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/28 7:54 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
Tuesday, May 23, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Tue 05/23 9:27 AM
Summons and notice issued to Rick Lee Jackson Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Saturday, May 20, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Sat 05/20 8:03 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-03653 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26273732, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, May 19, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 05/19 2:48 PM
Adversary case 17-03653 Complaint against Rick Lee Jackson filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2