Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-03688
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 22, 2017
Terminated:Jan 14, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
W.M.D. Heart Care LLC
Represented By
W.M.D. Heart Care LLC
contact info
Defendant
Zilin Wang
Represented By
Zilin Wang
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Jennifer Tennile Langley
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 14, 2020
8 8 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Tue 01/14 8:48 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2020
7 7 notice Notice of Dismissal Fri 01/10 2:59 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/18 3:28 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 8:56 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/30 8:12 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
Tuesday, May 23, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Tue 05/23 10:15 AM
Summons and notice issued to W.M.D. Heart Care LLC ; Zilin Wang Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, May 22, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 05/22 6:23 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-03688 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26281673, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 05/22 1:11 PM
Adversary case 17-03688 Complaint against W.M.D. Heart Care LLC, Zilin Wang filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2