Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-03690
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 22, 2017
Terminated:Sep 03, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Magnolia Adult, LLC
Represented By
Magnolia Adult, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Ira D. Lee, Jr.
Represented By
Ira D. Lee, Jr.
contact info
Defendant
Bilal Khodr
Represented By
Bilal Khodr
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Friday, September 03, 2021
19 19 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Fri 09/03 2:59 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
18 18 misc Judgment Satisfied Wed 07/29 10:32 AM
Judgment Satisfied Related [+] filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-] related document(s)9 Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
17 17 order Directing Tue 06/30 7:30 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney; Cullen Drescher Speckhart terminated; Robert S. Westermann for Richard Arrowsmith added (Motion filed in 15-32919 (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2019
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/17 11:52 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 24, 2018
15 15 court Certificate of Judgment for Registration in Another District Wed 10/24 12:19 PM
Certificate of Judgment for Registration in Another District Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Letter filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
14 14 court Certificate of Judgment for Registration in Another District Wed 10/24 12:18 PM
Certificate of Judgment for Registration in Another District Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)11 Letter filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
13 13 court Certificate of Judgment for Registration in Another District Wed 10/24 12:18 PM
Certificate of Judgment for Registration in Another District Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Letter filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, October 22, 2018
12 12 misc Letter Wed 10/24 12:05 PM
Letter requesting a certificate of judgment for registration in another district filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Letter Wed 10/24 12:03 PM
Letter requesting a certificate of judgment for registration in another district filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Letter Wed 10/24 12:01 PM
Letter requesting a certificate of judgment for registration in another district filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 06, 2018
9 9 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Mon 08/06 8:39 AM
Order Granting Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, July 06, 2018
8 8 misc Certification Fri 07/06 2:37 PM
Certification of No Objection Regarding Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,7 Notice of Motion filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
7 7 notice Notice of Motion (if setting a hearing, do not use) Tue 03/20 2:01 PM
Notice of Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
6 6 motion Entry of Default Tue 03/20 2:00 PM
Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 8:56 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/30 8:14 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
Tuesday, May 23, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Tue 05/23 10:19 AM
Summons and notice issued to Bilal Khodr ; Ira D. Lee, Jr. ; Magnolia Adult, LLC Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, May 22, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 05/22 6:22 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-03690 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26281651, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 05/22 5:36 PM
Adversary case 17-03690 Complaint against Magnolia Adult, LLC, Ira D. Lee, Jr., Bilal Khodr filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2