Charbel Maksoud v.Charles Lee Williams et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03856 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2017 1:12 AM PST |
Defendant
Lanamasha Hampton
|
|
Defendant
Lucent Wholesale Lighting and Fixtures, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Charles Lee Williams
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Heather Sowa
|
|
Defendant
Sonj Builders, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chante T. Moore
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J. Co Realty, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Collette Hines
|
|
Defendant
AEB Building Materials , LLC
|
|
Defendant
Syliva Gibson
|
|
Defendant
Edward-Remy Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deso Hair Bar, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cheryl Cobb-Debrosse
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ce-Chelle Investment Group, LLC
|
|
Defendant
CM7 Entertainment Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brace Scaffolding, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Carla Banks-Waddles
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Babycakes Productions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jason J Allen
|
|
Plaintiff
Dr. Charbel Maksoud
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
140 | 140
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 05/15 10:40 AM
Mail Returned addressed to Charles Lee Williams re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive132 . (iv) |