Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-03748
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 23, 2017
Terminated:May 20, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
YourMedicineKC.com LLC
Represented By
YourMedicineKC.com LLC
contact info
Defendant
Rhonda Simons
Represented By
Rhonda Simons
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Friday, May 20, 2022
28 28 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Fri 05/20 12:51 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
27 27 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 05/18 3:47 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Sunday, August 15, 2021
26 26 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Mon 08/16 12:08 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)23 Order on Motion to File Document(s) Under Seal
Friday, August 13, 2021
25 25 notice CerDocTyp - Notice of Deficient Filing Sat 08/14 12:13 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 21 Notice of Deficient Filing Issued
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion to File Document(s) Under Seal Fri 08/13 7:58 AM
Order Granting Motion to File Document(s) Under Seal Related [+] (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] 16
Thursday, August 12, 2021
22 22 misc Statement Thu 08/12 3:43 PM
Statement Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement or, Alternatively, Entry of Default Judgment and Motion to Seal Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,17 Notice of Hearing filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,18 Sealed Document filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,19 Notice of Hearing filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
21 21 court Deficient Filing Notice Request Wed 08/11 2:32 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing Issued to Rhonda Simons regarding filer signature omitted Related [+] Document(s) due by 8/25/2021. (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)20 Response to Motion/Application filed by Rhonda Simons
Monday, August 09, 2021
24 24 answer Response Fri 08/13 8:55 AM
Response to Motion Related [+] filed by Rhonda Simons. (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] -docketed to correct scanned pages related document(s)16 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
20 20 answer Response Tue 08/10 4:44 PM
Response to Related [+] filed by Rhonda Simons. (Bray, Lynessa)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
19 19 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 07/27 3:12 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 8/17/2021 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)18 Sealed Document filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
18 18 motion Sealed Document Tue 07/27 3:11 PM
Sealed Motion/Applicatio Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
17 17 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 07/27 3:11 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 8/17/2021 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
16 16 motion Motion to File Document(s) Under Seal Tue 07/27 3:10 PM
Motion to File Document(s) Under Seal Motion for Authority to File Under Seal a Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and to Seal the Hearing on the Motion to Enforce filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
15 15 order Directing Tue 06/30 8:09 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney; Cullen Drescher Speckhart terminated; Robert S. Westermann for Richard Arrowsmith added (Motion filed in 15-32919 (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2019
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/04 7:38 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Joshua David Stiff of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Stiff, Joshua)
Related: [-] related document(s)13 Order on Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney
Monday, October 28, 2019
13 13 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Mon 10/28 8:33 AM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Related [+]Diana L.C. McGraw terminated; (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, October 10, 2019
12 12 motion Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Thu 10/10 4:51 PM
Notice and Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney -Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel Related [+] . (Stiff, Joshua)
Related: [-] -Docketed to Include Certificate of Service
Thursday, October 03, 2019
11 11 motion Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Thu 10/03 1:38 PM
Notice and Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney -Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel . (Stiff, Joshua)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Thu 10/03 12:11 PM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw. (Stiff, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/10 11:22 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 30, 2018
8 8 5 pgs answer None Fri 03/30 11:16 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Rhonda Simons. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, March 01, 2018
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/01 2:26 PM
Amended Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Diana L.C. McGraw of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(McGraw, Diana)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY,4 Certificate of Service filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Att: 1 Order Approving Amended Procedures Governing Avoidance Action Adversary Proceedings
Att: 2 Order Approving Supplemental Procedures for Small Claims Actions
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/28 10:56 AM
Amended Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Diana L.C. McGraw of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(McGraw, Diana)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY,4 Certificate of Service filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Att: 1 Order Approving Amended Procedures Governing Avoidance Action Adversary Proceedings
Att: 2 Order Approving Supplemental Procedures for Small Claims Actions
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 8:56 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/30 8:56 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
Wednesday, May 24, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Wed 05/24 10:14 AM
Summons and notice issued to Rhonda Simons ; YourMedicineKC.com LLC Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, May 23, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 05/23 5:27 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-03748 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26290022, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 05/23 4:58 PM
Adversary case 17-03748 Complaint against YourMedicineKC.com LLC, Rhonda Simons filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2