Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-03752
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 23, 2017
Terminated:Sep 03, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
John Evan Balmer, Jr.
Represented By
John Evan Balmer, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Friday, September 03, 2021
15 15 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Fri 09/03 2:47 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
14 14 order Directing Tue 06/30 8:11 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney; Cullen Drescher Speckhart terminated; Robert S. Westermann for Richard Arrowsmith added (Motion filed in 15-32919 (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 26, 2020
13 13 misc Judgment Satisfied Fri 06/26 12:07 PM
Judgment Satisfied Related [+] filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-] related document(s)9 Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/11 4:43 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 15, 2018
11 11 court Certificate of Judgment for Registration in Another District Mon 10/15 1:42 PM
Certificate of Judgment for Registration in Another District Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Letter filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Friday, October 12, 2018
10 10 misc Letter Mon 10/15 1:25 PM
Letter requesting a certificate of judgment for registration in another district filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 06, 2018
9 9 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Mon 08/06 8:43 AM
Order Granting Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, August 03, 2018
8 8 misc Certification Fri 08/03 10:35 AM
Certification of No Objection Regarding Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,7 Notice of Motion filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
7 7 notice Notice of Motion (if setting a hearing, do not use) Tue 03/20 11:35 AM
Notice of Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
6 6 motion Entry of Default Tue 03/20 11:34 AM
Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 8:56 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/30 8:52 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
Wednesday, May 24, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Wed 05/24 10:18 AM
Summons and notice issued to John Evan Balmer, Jr. Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, May 23, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 05/23 5:27 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-03752 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26290022, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 05/23 5:13 PM
Adversary case 17-03752 Complaint against John Evan Balmer, Jr. filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2