Sadowski v. Bowling et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Paul Oetken |
Referred: | Debra C Freeman |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03954 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 05, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 20, 2017 4:44 AM EST |
Defendant
Suzanna Bowling
an individual, email: suzannabowling@hotmail.com 461 West 49th Street Apt. #A
New York, NY 10019 |
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Sadowski
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
David Basch
Terminated: 09/26/2017
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
order
Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
Tue 03/13 12:31 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff and Defendant Suzanna Bowling, an individual d/b/a Times Square Chronicles, by and through their respective counsels of record, hereby stipulate to the dismissal, with prejudice, of Plaintiff's complaint in its entirety. Each of the parties shall bear its own respective attorneys' fees, expenses and costs incurred in connection with the prosecution or defense of this action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/13/2018) (ama) |
|
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Terminated - Submitted
Mon 03/05 6:52 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 3/05/2018 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (ama) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Copyrights Information | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Mon 03/05 4:24 PM
ORDER: The Court has been informed that the parties have reached a settlement in principle of this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty days. All filing deadlines, conference dates, and the trial date are adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/05/2018) (ama) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Fri 01/12 6:47 PM
ORDER granting30 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Telephone conference adjourned to 2/20/18 at 10:30 a.m. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Debra Freeman)(Text Only Order) (Freeman, Debra) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Adjourn Conference
Thu 12/21 6:45 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Notice of Settlement addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Rayminh L. Ngo dated 12/21/2017. Document filed by Christopher Sadowski.(Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 12/13 4:34 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: It is now hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties shall participate in a telephonic case management conference call with this Court on December 22, 2017, at 11:00 a.m., and shall initiate such a call jointly with my Chambers, on that date. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 12/22/2017 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 12/8/2017) (anc) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel
Thu 12/07 12:55 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by Lori Leigh Cooper on behalf of Suzanna Bowling (Cooper, Lori) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel
Thu 12/07 12:20 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by Peter Samuel Sloane on behalf of Suzanna Bowling (Sloane, Peter) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 10/20 11:33 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case having been referred to me for general pretrial supervision, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: The Court will hold a case management conference on December 7, 2017, at 11:00 a.m.,in the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007, in Courtroom17 A. If Defendant retains counsel by that date, then the conference can be converted to a telephone conference. Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 10/20/2017) (js) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
service
Certificate of Service Other
Fri 10/06 1:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Appearance of Counsel served on Defendant on October 5, 2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Christopher Sadowski. (Brill, Robert) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 10/06 9:49 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/5/2017) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rj) |
|
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/06 9:47 AM
ORDER. Defendant Suzanna Bowling's oral request for the Court to request pro bono counsel is GRANTED. Based on Defendants representations to the Court, it appears that she is unable to afford retained counsel. The Office of Pro Se Litigation is requested to seek pro bono counsel. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/5/2017) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rjm) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 10/05 9:09 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Michael Brill on behalf of Christopher Sadowski. (Brill, Robert) |
|
21 | 21
order
Case Management Plan
Thu 10/05 6:42 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). Fact Discovery due by 2/2/2018. Expert Discovery due by 2/5/2018. Deposition due by 2/5/2018. Ready for Trial by 2/20/2018. This case is to be tried to a jury. Best estimate of the length of trial is 2-3 days. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/5/2017) MAILED TO PRO SE PARTY BY CHAMBERS. (ap) |
|
20 | 20
discov
Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Report
Thu 10/05 1:48 AM
RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Christopher Sadowski.(Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
misc
FRCP 4 Service Package - Mailed
Thu 10/05 3:34 PM
Defendant proceeding Pro Se was mailed an FRCP 4 (Information Package Mailed) to plaintiff at the address noted on the complaint/court's docket on 10/5/2017 via Regular Mail as per supervisor's instructions. The information package included: Judge's individual rules, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case files, A Motions Guide, A Notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address to use if your contact information changes, a consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, and consent to electronic service forms. (sbr) |
||
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Tue 10/17 5:06 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/5/2017. (bh) |
||
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Fri 09/29 7:41 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Suzanna Bowling served on 9/29/2017, answer due 10/20/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Christopher Sadowski. (Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
18 | 18
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 09/29 6:45 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Suzanna Bowling with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Christopher Sadowski. Related document:1 Complaint.(Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-F | ||
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
Tue 09/26 2:08 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT DAVID BASCH, WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Plaintiff Christopher Sadowski ("Plaintiff"), pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), hereby voluntarily dismisses this action with prejudice against Defendant David Basch d/b/a Times Square Chronicles (Defendant Basch). Plaintiff maintains all claims against Defendant Suzanna Bowling. Defendant Basch has neither answered Plaintiff's Complaint nor filed a motion for summary judgment. Therefore, this party may be dismissed without an order of the Court pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i). SO ORDERED.*** Party David Basch (an individual) terminated. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/22/2017) (ama) Modified on 9/26/2017 (ama) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
misc
Note to Attorney to E-Mail PDF
Fri 09/22 8:53 AM
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Rayminh Ngo for noncompliance with Section 18.3 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal to: judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. (km) |
||
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 09/21 5:19 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) David Basch. Document filed by Christopher Sadowski. (Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Mon 09/11 4:59 PM
ORDER: Counsel for the plaintiff Christopher Sadowski and any defendant who has been served with the complaint are directed to appear for an initial conference with the Court on October 5, 2017, at 11:15 a.m. The conference will be held in Courtroom 706 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Court House, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Those who appear at the pretrial conference must be authorized to negotiate terms of settlement. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/5/2017 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 706, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/11/2017) Copy of this Order and the Court's Individual Practice in Pro Se Cases mailed to Pro Se parties by Chambers.(ama) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 09/11 10:17 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Suzanna Bowling.(sc) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 09/11 10:04 AM
NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Suzanna Bowling. (sc) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 08/10 3:58 PM
ORDER: Defendant Suzanna Bowlings request for an extension of time to respond to the Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant Bowling shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by September 9, 2017. Suzanna Bowling answer due 9/9/2017. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/10/2017) (ap) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Wed 08/09 3:22 PM
LETTER from Suzanna Bowling, dated 8/9/17 re: EXTENSION OF TIME. Document filed by Suzanna Bowling.(sc) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Thu 05/25 1:00 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Basch. (kl) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Thu 05/25 12:58 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Suzanna Bowling. (kl) |
|
7 | 7
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted
Thu 05/25 12:53 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (kl) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Thu 05/25 12:48 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Rayminh L Ngo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Suzanna Bowling, David Basch. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (kl) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 05/25 12:49 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (kl) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 05/25 12:50 PM
Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (kl) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 05/25 12:51 PM
Case Designated ECF. (kl) |
||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/24 8:53 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Christopher Sadowski.(Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
5 | 5
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Wed 05/24 8:52 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 05/24 8:52 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Basch d/b/a Times Square Chronicles, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Sadowski. (Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 05/24 8:51 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Suzanna Bowling d/b/a Times Square Chronicles, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Sadowski. (Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 05/24 8:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/24 8:43 PM
COMPLAINT against David Basch, Suzanna Bowling. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13706542)Document filed by Christopher Sadowski.(Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-F |