Original Case: 3:13-cv-04065

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:17-cv-16072
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:May 23, 2017
Terminated:Sep 15, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 1:37 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellee
LYFT, INC.
Represented By
Simona Agnolucci
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Felix Shafir
Horvitz & Levy LLP
contact info
Thomas M. McInerney
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Jon B. Eisenberg
Horvitz & Levy LLP
contact info
R. James Slaughter
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Peder Kristian Batalden
Horvitz & Levy LLP
contact info
Movant - Appellant
ARCHIE OVERTON, Proposed Intervenor
Represented By
Archie Overton
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
PATRICK COTTER
Represented By
Shannon Liss-Riordan
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Matthew David Carlson
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ALEJANDRA MACIEL
Represented By
Shannon Liss-Riordan
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Matthew David Carlson
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JEFFREY KNUDTSON, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By
Shannon Liss-Riordan
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Matthew David Carlson
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/19/2017 1:29 AM PDT
Tuesday, May 23, 2017
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 06/19/2017. Transcript due 07/20/2017. Appellant Archie Overton opening brief due 08/28/2017. Appellees Patrick Cotter, Jeffrey Knudtson, Lyft, Inc. and Alejandra Maciel answering brief due 09/28/2017. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10446043] (RT) [Entered: 05/23/2017 04:47 PM]
Related: [-]