Peavy et al v. Axelrod
Alabama Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kristi K Dubose |
Referred: | P Bradley Murray |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00142 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 27, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 01, 2017 4:08 AM CDT |
Defendant
Barry Axelrod
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacob E. Peavy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katie L. Peavy
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
92 | 92
notice
Clerks Notice of Closing
Fri 07/27 10:47 AM
Clerk's Notice of Closing per doc. 91. No order will be entered. See Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F. 3d 1272 (11th Cir. 2012) (nah) |
|
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
91 | 91
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jacob E. Peavy, Katie L. Peavy. (O'Rear, Caine) |
|
utility
Document Referred
Thu 07/26 11:10 AM
REFERRAL OF91 Stipulation of Dismissal to Judge DuBose. (nah) |