New Jersey District Court
Judge:Kevin Mcnulty
Referred: Michael A Hammer
Case #: 2:17-cv-03798
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:May 27, 2017
Terminated:Dec 14, 2017
Last checked: Thursday Nov 23, 2017 3:56 AM EST
Defendant
LONG VALLEY PHARMACY, INC.
Represented By
TRACY A. ARMSTRONG
Wilentz, Goldman & Spitzer
contact info
Defendant
MICKEY SINGH
Represented By
TRACY A. ARMSTRONG
Wilentz, Goldman & Spitzer
contact info
Plaintiff
PINAKIN PATEL
Represented By
JODI J. JAFFE
Jaffe Glenn Law Group Pa.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, December 14, 2017
15 15 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Thu 12/14 10:49 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice ard without costs and/or attorneys' fees to any party, etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 12/13/2017. (ek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2017
14 14 order Order Wed 12/13 9:23 AM
TEXT ORDER: In view of the stipulation of dismissal13 , the telephone conference set for 1/25/2018 is cancelled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/13/2017. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
13 13 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 12/12 4:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by LONG VALLEY PHARMACY, INC., MICKEY SINGH. (ARMSTRONG, TRACY)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2017
12 12 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/24 9:53 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 1/25/2018 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. Amended Pleadings due by 1/12/2018. Fact discovery due by 5/25/2018. Motions due by 1/12/2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/23/2017. (sm, )
Related: [-]
11 11 order Scheduling Order Mon 10/23 4:37 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/25/2018 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Amended Pleadings due by 1/12/2018. Fact Discovery due by 5/25/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 1/12/2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/23/2017. (ek)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 10/24 9:46 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Scheduling Conference held on 10/23/2017. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2017
10 10 discov Joint Discovery Plan Thu 10/19 2:52 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by PINAKIN PATEL.(GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
utility Remark (public) Thu 10/19 11:51 AM
Remark: The parties must electronically file a joint discovery plan by 10/20/2017. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2017
9 9 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Thu 09/28 11:34 AM
LETTER ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2017 at 10:30 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/28/2017. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2017
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/04 7:21 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by LONG VALLEY PHARMACY, INC.. (ARMSTRONG, TRACY)
Related: [-]
7 7 9 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/04 7:19 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by LONG VALLEY PHARMACY, INC., MICKEY SINGH.(ARMSTRONG, TRACY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, June 30, 2017
6 6 order Order Fri 06/30 3:42 PM
ORDER granting Defendants'5 Application/Petition for an extension of time to answer, move or otherwise reply to the Complaint through and including August 4, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 06/30/2017. (ek)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 06/30 3:43 PM
Answer Due Deadline Update - The document5 Application/Petition filed by LONG VALLEY PHARMACY, INC., MICKEY SINGH submitted by MICKEY SINGH, LONG VALLEY PHARMACY, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 08/04/2017. (ek)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2017
5 5 misc Application/Petition Thu 06/29 3:04 PM
APPLICATION/PETITION for Extension of Time for by LONG VALLEY PHARMACY, INC., MICKEY SINGH. (BINETTI, MAUREEN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/07 7:58 PM
NOTICE by PINAKIN PATEL of Filing Proof of Service(JAFFE, JODI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Affidavit
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/07 7:54 PM
NOTICE by PINAKIN PATEL of Filing Consent to Join(JAFFE, JODI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Saturday, May 27, 2017
2 2 service Summons Issued Sun 05/28 9:44 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to LONG VALLEY PHARMACY, INC., MICKEY SINGH Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Reilly* (jr)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Sat 05/27 1:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Long Valley Pharmacy, Inc., Mickey Singh ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7864922) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Pinakin Patel.(JAFFE, JODI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Sun 05/28 9:42 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information should be entered in all capital letters . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Sun 05/28 9:43 AM
Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)
Related: [-]