Kleszynski v. General Motors Company et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Ann M Donnelly |
Referred: | Robert M Levy |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03213 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:77 Securities Fraud |
Case Filed: | May 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Nov 23, 2017 4:17 AM EST |
Defendant
Daniel F. Akerson
|
|
Defendant
Daniel Ammann
|
|
Defendant
Mary T. Barra
|
|
Defendant
General Motors Company
|
|
Defendant
Charles K. Stevens, III
|
|
Movant
Duane Creedon
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Richard Donohue
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Jimmy Greathouse
|
Represented By
|
Movant
KBC Asset Management NV
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Chaz Motter
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Edward Sutor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Kleszynski
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
utility
Transfer Case Opened
Tue 08/08 1:46 PM
CASE: 1:17-cv-03213 DETAILS: Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Eastern District of Michigan as case 2:17-cv-12565, filed 08/08/2017. (Marziliano, August) |
||
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other) Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Mon 08/07 10:18 AM
Stipulation to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan. Case transferred to District of Eastern District of Michigan. Case extracted via ECF. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 8/7/2017. (Greene, Donna) |
||
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation
Fri 08/04 10:33 PM
STIPULATION to transfer action to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan by Daniel F. Akerson, Daniel Ammann, Mary T. Barra, General Motors Company, Charles K. Stevens, III (Haskel, Warren) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/26 10:50 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by KBC Asset Management NV identifying Corporate Parent KBC Group NV for KBC Asset Management NV. (Buchman, Michael) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Declaration
Wed 07/26 10:45 PM
DECLARATION re11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by KBC Asset Management NV (Buchman, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Certification, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B Loss Chart, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C Notice, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D Resume | ||
12 | 12
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Wed 07/26 10:38 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by KBC Asset Management NV. (Buchman, Michael) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 07/26 10:36 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by KBC Asset Management NV. (Buchman, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 07/26 10:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by Richard Donohue. (Portnoy, Lesley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
9 | 9
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Wed 07/26 10:10 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by Richard Donohue. (Portnoy, Lesley) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 07/26 10:09 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff by Richard Donohue. (Portnoy, Lesley) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Wed 07/26 6:59 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiffs filed by Duane Creedon, Jimmy Greathouse, Robert Kleszynski, Chaz Motter, Edward Sutor. (Kim, Phillip) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 07/26 6:57 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiffs by Robert Kleszynski, Jimmy Greathouse, Edward Sutor, Chaz Motter, Duane Creedon. (Kim, Phillip) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/02 3:03 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 06/01 2:37 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,, by Robert Kleszynski (Kim, Phillip) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 06/01 12:34 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 06/01 12:32 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
utility
Incorrect Case-Document Information
Tue 05/30 10:29 AM
Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information. Counsel is advised an address must be included with the Defendant's name on Summonses. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
||
Saturday, May 27, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sat 05/27 7:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Daniel F. Akerson, Daniel Ammann, Mary T. Barra, General Motors Company, Charles K. Stevens, III filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9561027 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Robert Kleszynski. (Kim, Phillip) |
|
Att: 1 PSLRA Certification, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons to Daniel F. Akerson, | ||
Att: 4 Summons to Daniel Ammann, | ||
Att: 5 Summons to Mary T. Barra, | ||
Att: 6 Summons to General Motors Company, | ||
Att: 7 Summons to Charles K. Stevens III | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/01 12:32 PM
Case assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |