Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-03846
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 26, 2017
Terminated:Jan 14, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Causeway Medical LLC
Represented By
Causeway Medical LLC
contact info
Defendant
Lynn Mercurio
Represented By
Lynn Mercurio
contact info
Defendant
Greg J. Mercurio
Represented By
Greg J. Mercurio
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Friday, January 14, 2022
38 38 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Fri 01/14 3:48 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
37 37 misc Judgment Satisfied Mon 01/10 2:02 PM
Judgment Satisfied Related [+] filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-] related document(s)17 Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
35 35 order Directing Wed 10/20 3:23 PM
Garnishment Disposition Order. Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)19 Garnishment Summons,22 Garnishment Summons,25 Garnishment Summons
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
36 36 answer Answer Tue 10/26 3:50 PM
Answer -Garnishee's Answer Related [+] filed by Truist. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)22 Garnishment Summons
34 34 answer Answer Thu 10/14 2:43 PM
Answer -Garnishee's Answer Related [+] filed by Truist. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)25 Garnishment Summons
33 33 court Hearing held Tue 10/12 1:52 PM
Hearing held; Garnishments Dismissed. Appearance(s): Brittany Falabella Related [+] (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)19 Garnishment Summons,22 Garnishment Summons,25 Garnishment Summons
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
32 32 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/05 11:57 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by US Marshals Service. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)25 Garnishment Summons,26 Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
31 31 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/05 11:55 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by US Marshals Service. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)19 Garnishment Summons,20 Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
30 30 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/05 11:53 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by US Marshals Service. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)19 Garnishment Summons,20 Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
29 29 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/05 11:51 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by US Marshals Service. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)22 Garnishment Summons,23 Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
28 28 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/05 11:49 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by US Marshals Service. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)22 Garnishment Summons,23 Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
27 27 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/05 11:35 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by US Marshals Service. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)25 Garnishment Summons,26 Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
26 26 misc Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal Tue 09/28 4:44 PM
Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
25 25 summon Garnishment Summons (HDL) Tue 09/28 4:44 PM
Garnishment Summons; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)24 Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
24 24 misc Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment Tue 09/28 4:42 PM
Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment -Greg Mercurio filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal Tue 09/28 4:19 PM
Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
22 22 summon Garnishment Summons (HDL) Tue 09/28 4:18 PM
Garnishment Summons; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)21 Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
21 21 misc Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment Tue 09/28 4:17 PM
Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment -Causeway Medical LLC filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal Tue 09/28 11:59 AM
Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
19 19 summon Garnishment Summons (HDL) Tue 09/28 11:58 AM
Garnishment Summons; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)18 Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
18 18 misc Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment Tue 09/28 11:57 AM
Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment -Lynn Mercurio filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
17 17 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Wed 08/18 2:22 PM
Order Granting Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] 14
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
16 16 misc Statement Wed 07/28 12:13 PM
Statement of Certification of No Objection Regarding Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-] related document(s)14 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of Motion (if setting a hearing, do not use) Wed 04/21 4:04 PM
Notice of Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-] related document(s)14 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
14 14 motion Entry of Default Wed 11/04 3:24 PM
Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s)
Att: 2 Exhibit(s)
Friday, October 09, 2020
13 13 notice Notice of Dismissal Fri 10/09 4:12 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Staci Appleton filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
12 12 order Directing Tue 06/30 8:46 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney; Cullen Drescher Speckhart terminated; Robert S. Westermann for Richard Arrowsmith added (Motion filed in 15-32919 (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 01, 2020
11 11 misc Statement Fri 05/01 2:44 PM
Statement (Mediator's Report) filed by Christian K. Vogel of Vogel & Cromwell, LLC on behalf of Christian K. Vogel. (Vogel, Christian)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2019
10 10 answer None Fri 10/04 5:58 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by William R. Baldwin III of Meyer Baldwin Long & Moore LLP on behalf of Staci Appleton. (Baldwin, William)
Related: [-] 6
Wednesday, September 04, 2019
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Wed 09/04 4:16 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Amended Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, July 10, 2019
8 8 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Wed 07/10 9:20 AM
Alias Summons and notice issued to Staci Appleton ; Causeway Medical LLC ; Greg J. Mercurio ; Lynn Mercurio Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Amended Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, July 09, 2019
7 7 misc Request for Alias Summons Tue 07/09 1:08 PM
Request for Alias Summons for Causeway Medical LLC, Lynn Mercurio, Greg J. Mercurio, and Staci Appleton Related [+] filed by Olga Antle of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Antle, Olga)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Amended Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 07/03 12:50 PM
Amended Complaint against Staci Appleton, Causeway Medical LLC, Greg J. Mercurio, Lynn Mercurio Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 9:01 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/06 3:51 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
Tuesday, May 30, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Tue 05/30 7:49 AM
Summons and notice issued to Causeway Medical LLC ; Greg J. Mercurio ; Lynn Mercurio Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Friday, May 26, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 05/26 9:54 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-03846 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26313190, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 05/26 8:31 PM
Adversary case 17-03846 Complaint against Causeway Medical LLC, Lynn Mercurio, Greg J. Mercurio filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2